Austin v. Caliber Home Loans et al
Plaintiff: Nancy C. Austin
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. and Caliber Home Loans
Case Number: 1:2018cv04860
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Alan J Baverman
Referring Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Submission of #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (bnw)
November 28, 2018 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Caliber Home Loans, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Anderson, Keith)
November 19, 2018 Submission of #9 Order to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (bnw)
November 16, 2018 Clerks Notation re #10 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC. (lwb)
November 15, 2018 Clerks Notation re #10 Certificate of Interested Persons--Reviewed and approved by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 11/15/18. (cp)
November 13, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Nancy C. Austin. (bnw)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons by Nancy C. Austin. (bnw)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff SHALL file her certificateof interested persons / corporate disclosure statement within (10) days of this Order. Failure to timely comply with this Order may result in sanctions, up to and including the striking of pleadings or dismissal of the action. The Clerk is DIRECTED to re-submit this Order to the undersigned for further consideration if Plaintiff fails to comply within the specified time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 10/29/18. (bnw)
October 29, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Nancy C. Austin re #9 Order to Show Cause. (bnw)
October 29, 2018 Clerks Notation re #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement reviewed by MHC. (lwb)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 FILED IN ERRORCLERK'S JUDGMENT: it is Ordered and Adjudged that this action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (bnw)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- Modified on 10/26/2018 to edit text(bnw).
October 26, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caliber Home Loans, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Merscorp Holdings, Inc. for Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc.; Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. by Caliber Home Loans, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A..(Anderson, Keith)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Caliber Home Loans, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Anderson, Keith)
October 26, 2018 Notification of Docket Correction re #8 Clerk's Judgment: CLERK'S ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. (bnw)
October 23, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Nancy C. Austin re #5 Notice to Pro Se Parties. (bnw)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE to Pro Se Parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 10/23/18. (bnw)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 10/22/18. (bnw)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Caliber Home Loans, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Keith)
October 22, 2018 Submission of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (bnw)
October 22, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Nancy C. Austin re #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. (bnw)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Nancy C. Austin. (bnw)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., Caliber Home Loans. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-8219563) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Austin v. Caliber Home Loans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy C. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Keith Steven Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc.
Represented By: Keith Steven Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans
Represented By: Keith Steven Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?