Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. v. United States Department of Justice

Plaintiff: Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 1:2018cv05007
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:0552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Administrative Order Staying Civil Proceedings in Light of Lapse Appropriations. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/26/2018. (adg)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time through 1/2/19 for Defendant to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 12/4/18. (jpa)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Motion for Enlargment of Time, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Samuel)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Hermann, Kimberly) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. United States Department of Justice served on 11/5/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service - U.S. Department of Justice, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service - U.S. Attorney NDGA)(Hermann, Kimberly)
November 5, 2018 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. (jtj)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to the U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attorney General Jeff Sessions) (jtj)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8240718. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Summons AG, #5 Proposed Summons US Atty, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (jtj) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. v. United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Samuel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Stewart Hermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?