Wilson v. Kelly et al

Plaintiff: Ricardo Wilson
Defendant: Universal Music, Robert (R. Kelly) Kelly and Jive Records
Case Number: 1:2018cv05014
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Charles A Pannell
Referring Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ricardo Wilson re #5 Order. (bdb)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - The Court finds that Plaintiff's #3 Complaint may move forward as to Defendant Kelly only. As such, the copyright infringement claims alleged against Defendants Universal and Jive are DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A. In light of Plaintiff's pro se status, the Court will provide Plaintiff the opportunity, should he wish to do so, to replead (i.e., file an amended complaint) his copyright infringement claims as to Universal and Jive. In the event he chooses this option, Plaintiff is directed to include sufficient factual matter setting forth the who, what, when, where, why and how concerning those infringement claims directed at Universal and Jive. Such factual information must be enough to place Universal and Jive on notice as to their individual roles in the alleged infringement such that they are vested with Letter. The amended complaint, if any, shall supersede the original in all respects and must therefore contain all of Plaintiff's allegations and claims. The amended complaint, if filed, must be filed not later than January 9, 2019. If Plaintiff chooses instead to forego filing an amended complaint, the instant Complaint [Doc. 3] shall remain the operative pleading in this matter but the caption shall be amended by the Clerk's Office to reflect that Universal and Jive have been dismissed from this lawsuit. In addition, the Clerks Office is directed to resubmit this matter to the undersigned if no amended complaint is filed by the January 9, 2019 deadline. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 12/14/2018. (bdb)
December 12, 2018 Submission of #3 Complaint for frivolity determination, to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (tcc)
December 12, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ricardo Wilson re #4 Order Reassigning Case. (tcc)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Amy Totenberg for all further proceedings. Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:18-cv-05014-AT. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 12/10/2018. (tcc)
December 7, 2018 Submission of #3 Complaint to District Judge Charles A. Pannell Jr.. (bnw)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Ricardo Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
December 7, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ricardo Wilson re #2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (bnw)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 12/7/18. (bnw)
October 31, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ricardo Wilson re AO Form 121 - Notice to Parties. (rlb)
October 31, 2018 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 121. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 121. See LR 3.4. Docket the form using the event AO 121, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (rlb)
October 31, 2018 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (rlb)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ricardo Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Violation (Complaint), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rlb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Kelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert (R. Kelly) Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jive Records
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?