Lee v. Synchrony Bank

Plaintiff: Benjenia Lee
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Case Number: 1:2018cv05044
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Bly
Referring Judge: Clarence Cooper
2 Judge: Linda T Walker
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Synchrony Bank. (dob)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Benjenia Lee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C Bly on 12/6/2018. (dob)
November 27, 2018 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C Bly. (adg)
November 27, 2018 Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher C Bly. Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:18-cv-05044-CC-CCB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (adg)
November 1, 2018 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (rlb)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Benjenia Lee. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons for Synchrony Financial)(rlb) Modified on 11/1/2018 to edit document name (rlb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Synchrony Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjenia Lee
Represented By: Miriam Fisher Gutman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?