Gebo Cermex USA, Inc. et al v. ACMI USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gebo Cermex USA, Inc., Gebo Cermex Canada Inc. and Gebo Packaging Solutions France S.A.S.
Defendant: ACMI S.p.A. and ACMI USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv05082
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons by ACMI S.p.A., ACMI USA, Inc.. (North, John)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants have up to and through January 25, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/27/2018. (jtj)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ACMI S.p.A., ACMI USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(North, John)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order: Guidelines to Parties and Counsel Proceeding Before the Honorable Amy Totenberg. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto.To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/13/2018. (jtj)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (eop)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to ACMI S.p.A.. (eop)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to ACMI USA, Inc.. (eop)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Gebo Cermex USA, Inc., Gebo Cermex Canada Inc. and Gebo Packaging Solutions France S.A.S.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8250645) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A - USPN 6168005, #2 Exhibit -B - T. Eltzer Declaration, #3 Exhibit -C - Letter -10/29/10, #4 Exhibit -D - Letter -11/22/10, #5 Exhibit -E - Letter -11/3/11, #6 Exhibit -F - Letter -11/9/11, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gebo Cermex USA, Inc. et al v. ACMI USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gebo Cermex USA, Inc.
Represented By: Norman Andrew Crain
Represented By: Wesley Austin Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gebo Cermex Canada Inc.
Represented By: Norman Andrew Crain
Represented By: Wesley Austin Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gebo Packaging Solutions France S.A.S.
Represented By: Norman Andrew Crain
Represented By: Wesley Austin Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACMI S.p.A.
Represented By: John L. North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACMI USA, Inc.
Represented By: John L. North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?