Common Cause Georgia v. Kemp
Plaintiff: Common Cause Georgia
Defendant: Brian Kemp
Amicus Curiae: Greg Palast
Case Number: 1:2018cv05102
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting #77 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Petitioner Jeanne Ellen Mirer. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 12/31/18. (hfm)
December 27, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #77 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeanne Ellen Mirer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8324552). Attorney Jeanne Ellen Mirer added appearing on behalf of Greg Palast (pmb)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER on JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR SERVING INITIAL DISCLOSURES: The deadline for the serving of Initial Disclosures shall be extended to January 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 12/19/2018. (rlb)
December 19, 2018 Filing 79 STIPULATION For Extension of Time for Serving Initial Disclosures by Common Cause Georgia. (Sugarman, F.)
December 13, 2018 Filing 78 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 12/31/18-01/04/2019, 03/01/2019-03/15/2019, by F. Skip Sugarman. (Sugarman, F.)
December 12, 2018 Filing 77 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeanne Ellen Mirer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8324552)by Greg Palast. (Spears, George)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 SCHEDULING ORDER re #75 parties' Revised Joint Proposed Schedule, the Court ORDERS that the deadlines for completing discovery, filing dispositive motions and trial are as stated in the Revised Joint Proposed Schedule. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 12/10/2018. (bdb)
December 7, 2018 Submission of #75 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan, to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bdb)
December 7, 2018 Filing 75 Amended JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Common Cause Georgia. (Sugarman, F.)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Petitioner Makiko Hiromi. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 12/7/18. (hfm)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #69 Motion of Investigative Report Greg Palast to File an Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 12/7/2018. (bdb)
November 29, 2018 Submission of #71 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan, to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bdb)
November 28, 2018 Filing 73 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Totenberg: Telephone Conference held on 11/28/2018 re Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The parties are to file an amended proposed scheduling order by Friday, December 7, 2018. (Court Reporter Shannon Welch)(bdb)
November 28, 2018 Filing 72 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Brian Kemp. Discovery ends on 4/29/2019.(Tyson, Bryan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 26, 2018 Filing 71 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Common Cause Georgia. (Sugarman, F.)
November 20, 2018 Filing 70 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference Proceedings held on 11/14/2018, before Judge Amy Totenberg. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shannon R. Welch, RMR, CRR, Telephone number 404-215-1383. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/11/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/21/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (srw)
November 15, 2018 Filing 69 MOTION of Investigative Reporter Greg Palast to File an Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiff, with Brief In Support by Greg Palast. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Supplement Proposed Amicus Statement, #3 Exhibit A-Greg Palast Affidavit, #4 Exhibit In support of Palast Affidavit-, #5 Exhibit B-Palast, et al v. Kemp, #6 Exhibit C-Affidavit of Rachel Garbus)(Mirer, Jeanne) Modified on 11/16/2018 to edit docket text. (jtj)
November 15, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Makiko Hiromi Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8260372). Attorney Makiko Hiromi added appearing on behalf of Common Cause Georgia (pmb)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting #10 and #14 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Petitioners Wendy Weiser and William E. Freeland. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/15/18. (hfm)
November 14, 2018 Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Totenberg: Telephone Conference held on 11/14/2018 re #66 Order. (Court Reporter Shannon Welch)(jpa)
November 14, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #14 APPLICATION for Admission of William E Freeland Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8260380). Attorney William E. Freeland added appearing on behalf of Common Cause Georgia (cdg)
November 14, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Wendy Weiser Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8260370). Attorney Wendy Weiser added appearing on behalf of Common Cause Georgia (cdg)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting #12 and #13 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioners Melina Maria Meneguin Layerenza and Robert A Atkins. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/14/18. (hfm)
November 14, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Service via E-Mail re #66 Corrected Order, #67 Order Scheduling Teleconference to attorneys of record for Gwinnett County Board of Voter Registration and Elections in case number 1:18-cv-04789-LMM. (hfm)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Scheduling Teleconference. Teleconference set for 11/14/2018 at 12:30 before Judge Amy Totenberg. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/14/18. (hfm)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 CORRECTED ORDER re #65 Order. Order amended to correct referenced case numbers. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/14/18. (hfm)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER that Defendant SHALL NO LATER THAN NOON TODAY direct the Gwinnett Board of Registrars to: (1) proceed immediately to implement the supplemental review and relief process for PR coded provisional ballots ordered by the Court in Paragraph (2)(i) of its November 12, 2018 Order; (2) undertake all good faith efforts to verify the eligibility of any PR coded provisional ballot voters who have presented documentation of their registration status after the election through 2:00 p.m. on November 15, 2018, considering any information brought forth by voters as to their eligibility and all other information accessible to the Board of Registrars as to their registration status; and (3) add to the vote count to be certified all votes in those PR coded provisional ballots that are approved after this supplemental review (and any others previously approved), consistent with this Courts November 12, 2018 Order. The Court SHALL hold a telephone conference with counsel regarding the status of implementation of the remedy directed in the November 12, 2018 Order TODAY AT 12:30 PM and whether all counties that have submitted vote certifications have been transmitted the directive identified in the Order. Defendant is authorized to invite counsel for Gwinnett County to participate in this call. Counsel are DIRECTED to contact the Courts deputy clerk, Harry Martin, to provide a proposed conference call telephone call-in number no later than 10:00 A.M. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order as well as its Order of November 12, 2018 to counsel of record for the Gwinnett County Board of Registrars (or Gwinnett County or the County itself who are appearing in Martin, et. al v. Crittenden, Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2989-LMM (N.D. Ga)). Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/14/18. (hfm)
November 13, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #13 APPLICATION for Admission of Robert A Atkins Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8260379). Attorney Robert A. Atkins added appearing on behalf of Common Cause Georgia (pmb)
November 13, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Melina Maria Meneguin Layerenza Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8260377). Attorney Melinda Maria Meneguin Layerenza added appearing on behalf of Common Cause Georgia (pmb)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting #6 and #7 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Petitioners Farrah R Berse and Maximillian Feldman. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/13/18. (hfm)
November 13, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Josh Belinfante, Ryan Teague, and Kimberly Anderson on behalf of Brian Kemp. (Teague, William)
November 13, 2018 Filing 63 DEFENDANT'S EXHIBITS 1 AND 2 admitted and retained at the #38 TRO Hearing. Exhibits received from Courtroom Deputy and placed in the custody of the Records Clerks. (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Exhibits 1 and 2) (jtj)
November 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Order GRANTING IN PART Plaintiff's #15 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Discovery and DENYING Defendant's #52 Motion to Strike the Declarations of Michael McDonald, Edgardo Cortes, and Kevin Morris. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/12/2018. (acm)
November 12, 2018 Filing 61 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. F. Skip Sugarman replacing attorney Christopher G. Campbell. (Sugarman, F.)
November 11, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE by Common Cause Georgia re #37 Response in Support of Motion, (Plaintiff's Supplemental Submission Regarding Standing) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rudolph C. Richter, #2 Declaration of Eugenia Lea Willingham)(Campbell, Christopher)
November 11, 2018 Filing 59 RESPONSE re #57 Response (Non-Motion), filed by Common Cause Georgia. (Campbell, Christopher)
November 11, 2018 Filing 58 AFFIDAVIT re #55 Response in Support of Motion, (Supplemental Declaration of Kevin T. Morris) by Common Cause Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Campbell, Christopher)
November 11, 2018 Filing 57 RESPONSE re #55 Response in Support of Motion, #38 Evidentiary Hearing, Sunday Supplemental General Submission in Response to Court's Requests for Information and Suggestion of Mootness of Plaintiff's Motion for TRO filed by Brian Kemp. (Tyson, Bryan)
November 10, 2018 Filing 56 AFFIDAVIT re #55 Response in Support of Motion, (Supplemental Declaration of Sara Henderson) by Common Cause Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Campbell, Christopher)
November 10, 2018 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Support re #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Discovery IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED (Plaintiff's Supplemental Submission in Support of Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order) filed by Common Cause Georgia. (Campbell, Christopher)
November 10, 2018 Filing 54 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Proceedings held on 11/8/2018, before Judge Amy Totenberg. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shannon R. Welch, RMR, CRR, Telephone number 404-215-1383. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/3/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/11/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (srw)
November 10, 2018 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re #52 MOTION to Strike #50 Affidavit, #48 Affidavit, #46 Affidavit filed by Common Cause Georgia. (Campbell, Christopher)
November 9, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION to Strike #50 Affidavit, #48 Affidavit, #46 Affidavit by Brian Kemp. (Belinfante, Joshua)
November 9, 2018 RETURN of #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Lawrence Norden Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8260368) to attorney for correction re: NY. (pmb)
November 9, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Farrah R Berse Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8260340). Attorney Farrah R. Berse added appearing on behalf of Common Cause Georgia (pmb)
November 9, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Maximillian Feldman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8260359). Attorney Maximillian Feldman added appearing on behalf of Common Cause Georgia (pmb)
November 9, 2018 Filing 50 AFFIDAVIT - Declaration of Kevin Morris by Common Cause Georgia. (Campbell, Christopher)
November 9, 2018 Filing 49 AFFIDAVIT - Declaration of Logan Lamb by Common Cause Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Campbell, Christopher)
November 9, 2018 Filing 48 AFFIDAVIT - Declaration of Edgardo Cortes by Common Cause Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Campbell, Christopher)
November 9, 2018 Filing 47 RESPONSE re #41 Order,, Supplemental Submission of Plaintiff Common Cause Georgia filed by Common Cause Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Campbell, Christopher)
November 9, 2018 Filing 46 AFFIDAVIT re #41 Order,, - Declaration of Michael McDonald by Common Cause Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Campbell, Christopher)
November 9, 2018 Filing 45 AFFIDAVIT re #41 Order,, Defendants Submission Of The Declaration Of John Alford by Brian Kemp. (Belinfante, Joshua)
November 9, 2018 Filing 44 REPLY BRIEF re #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Discovery IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED filed by Brian Kemp. (Belinfante, Joshua)
November 9, 2018 Filing 43 RESPONSE re #38 Evidentiary Hearing, of Defendants Supplemental General Submission In Response To Courts Request For Information filed by Brian Kemp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Belinfante, Joshua)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part #42 Motion for Extension of Time to comply with the Court's #41 Order. Defendant and Plaintiff may have until 4:00 PM today to file the requested affidavits. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/9/18. (hfm)
November 9, 2018 Filing 42 MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with the Court's Order Requesting Expert Testimony re: #41 Order,, by Brian Kemp. (Belinfante, Joshua)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to file an affidavit from a qualified statistician, NO LATER THAN 3:00 PM TODAY, based on the election data provided by Defendant in the Affidavit of Chris Harvey, regarding whether or not there is a statistically significant increase in the percentage of provisional ballots cast, relative to the total number of ballots cast, as follows: (a) between the 2018 election and the 2016 election; and (b) between the 2018 election and the 2014 election. Defendant may also submit an affidavit NO LATER THAN 3:00 PM TODAY. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/9/19. (hfm)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Petitioner Myrna Perez. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/9/18. (hfm)
November 9, 2018 Filing 40 RESPONSE re #38 Evidentiary Hearing, General Submission in Response to Court's Request for Information filed by Brian Kemp. (Belinfante, Joshua)
November 9, 2018 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Support re #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Discovery IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED / Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law Regarding Standing in Further Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order filed by Common Cause Georgia. (Campbell, Christopher)
November 8, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Jody Marie Rhodes on behalf of Common Cause Georgia. (tcc)
November 8, 2018 Filing 39 (FILED UNDER SEAL ) Declaration of Theresa Payton in Support of #32 Response in Opposition to Motion by Brian Kemp (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(adg)
November 8, 2018 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Totenberg: Evidentiary Hearing held on 11/8/2018. Oral argument re #15 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Defendants witnesses Chris Harvey and Merritt Beaver sworn and testified. Defendants exhibits 1 and 2 admitted. (Court Reporter Shannon Welch)(jpa)
November 8, 2018 Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Discovery IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED / Declaration of Jordan Barry filed by Common Cause Georgia. (Campbell, Christopher)
November 8, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Myrna Perez Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8260367). Attorney Myrna Perez added appearing on behalf of Common Cause Georgia (pmb)
November 8, 2018 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT re #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Discovery - Declaration of Dan S. Wallach - by Common Cause Georgia. (Campbell, Christopher) Modified on 11/8/2018 (hfm).
November 8, 2018 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT re #32 Response in Opposition to Motion - Declaration of Merritt Beaver by Brian Kemp. (Belinfante, Joshua)
November 8, 2018 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT re #32 Response in Opposition to Motion - Declaration of Chris Harvey by Brian Kemp. (Belinfante, Joshua)
November 8, 2018 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Discovery filed by Brian Kemp. (Belinfante, Joshua) Modified on 11/8/2018 (hfm).
November 8, 2018 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT re #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Discovery - Declaration of India Owens - by Common Cause Georgia. (Campbell, Christopher) Modified on 11/8/2018 (hfm).
November 8, 2018 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT re #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Discovery - Declaration of Jennifer Rose Flanagan - by Common Cause Georgia. (Campbell, Christopher) Modified on 11/8/2018 (hfm).
November 8, 2018 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT re #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Discovery - Declaration of Sara Henderson - by Common Cause Georgia. (Campbell, Christopher) Modified on 11/8/2018 (hfm).
November 8, 2018 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT re #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Discovery - Declaration of Kathryn Grant - by Common Cause Georgia. (Campbell, Christopher) Modified on 11/8/2018 (hfm).
November 8, 2018 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT re #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Discovery - Declaration of Harrison Wood by Common Cause Georgia. (Campbell, Christopher) Modified on 11/8/2018 (hfm).
November 8, 2018 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT re #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Discovery Declaration of Joshua A. Geltzer by Common Cause Georgia. (Campbell, Christopher) Modified on 11/8/2018 (hfm).
November 8, 2018 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT re #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Discovery - Declaration of Kevin Morris by Common Cause Georgia. (Campbell, Christopher) Modified on 11/8/2018 (hfm).
November 8, 2018 Filing 24 Return of Service Executed by Common Cause Georgia. Brian Kemp served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (Campbell, Christopher)
November 8, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly K. Anderson on behalf of Brian Kemp (Anderson, Kimberly)
November 8, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Barrett Belinfante on behalf of Brian Kemp (Belinfante, Joshua)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to either: (1) be prepared to submit testimony from a witness on behalf of Common Cause Georgia to establish a basis for the organizations standing in this matter, or (2) to file an affidavit from an individual representative on behalf of Common Cause Georgia to establish a basis for the organizations standing in this matter NO LATER THAN 1:30 PM TODAY. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/8/18. (hfm)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: The Court DIRECTS Defendant to be prepared to address the following at the hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Discovery: (1) The total number of provisional ballots issued and returned statewide in the November 6, 2018 general election; (2) The total number of provisional ballots issued and returned by county in the November 6, 2018, general election; and (3) How the number of provisional ballots for the November 6, 2018, general election compares to the data on provisional ballots for the 2016 and 2014 general elections both by county and statewide. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/8/18. (hfm)
November 7, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan P. Tyson on behalf of Brian Kemp (Tyson, Bryan)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The Court has scheduled a hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Discovery. Upon reviewing the Motion, the Court anticipates that Plaintiff will need to submit testimony from a witness at the hearing or an affidavit from one or more election observers (poll watchers) or participants in the November 6, 2018 general election with regard to the factual issues raised in Plaintiffs Motion. The Court DIRECTS Plaintiffs counsel to serve a copy of this Order on the Defendant. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/7/18. (hfm)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Scheduling Immediate Hearing re #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Hearing set for 11/8/2018 at 02:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2308 before Judge Amy Totenberg. The Court DIRECTS Plaintiffs counsel to serve a copy of this Order on the Defendant. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/7/18. (hfm)
November 7, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Certificate of Compliance by Christopher G. Campbell on behalf of Common Cause Georgia (Campbell, Christopher)
November 7, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Discovery IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED with Brief In Support by Common Cause Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Affidavit, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Campbell, Christopher)
November 7, 2018 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of William E Freeland Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8260380)by Common Cause Georgia. (Campbell, Christopher)
November 7, 2018 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Robert A Atkins Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8260379)by Common Cause Georgia. (Campbell, Christopher)
November 7, 2018 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Melina Maria Meneguin Layerenza Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8260377)by Common Cause Georgia. (Campbell, Christopher)
November 7, 2018 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Makiko Hiromi Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8260372)by Common Cause Georgia. (Campbell, Christopher)
November 7, 2018 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Wendy Weiser Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8260370)by Common Cause Georgia. (Campbell, Christopher)
November 7, 2018 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Lawrence Norden Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8260368)by Common Cause Georgia. (Campbell, Christopher)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Myrna Perez Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8260367)by Common Cause Georgia. (Campbell, Christopher)
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Maximillian Feldman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8260359)by Common Cause Georgia. (Campbell, Christopher)
November 7, 2018 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Farrah R Berse Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8260340)by Common Cause Georgia. (Campbell, Christopher)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Courts Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/6/18. (ddm)
November 6, 2018 Submission of #1 Complaint to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (cmd)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: After a review of this case, the Court finds that it is related to Curling v. Kemp, 1:17-cv-02989-AT, as indicated on Plaintiff's civil cover sheet. [Doc. 1-1]. Accordingly, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk to reassign this case to Judge Amy Totenberg. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 11/6/2018. (cmd)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Brian Kemp. (cmd)
November 6, 2018 Submission of #1 Complaint to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (cmd)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed by Common Cause Georgia. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8254855) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmd) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Common Cause Georgia v. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kemp
Represented By: Kimberly K. Anderson
Represented By: William Ryan Teague
Represented By: Joshua Barrett Belinfante
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Common Cause Georgia
Represented By: Christopher G. Campbell
Represented By: Robert A. Atkins
Represented By: F. Skip Sugarman
Represented By: Wendy Weiser
Represented By: William E. Freeland
Represented By: Melina Maria Meneguin Layerenza
Represented By: Makiko Hiromi
Represented By: Jody Marie Rhodes
Represented By: Maximillian Feldman
Represented By: Farrah R. Berse
Represented By: Myrna Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Greg Palast
Represented By: Jeanne Ellen Mirer
Represented By: George Brian Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?