Air Control Music, Inc. et al v. Monger Entertainment Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Air Control Music, Inc., Uh Oh Entertainment, Boomer X Publishing, Inc., North Avenue Music, Bovina Music, Inc., Dead Game Publishing, Divine Mill Music and Fingaz Goal Music
Defendant: Sampson B. Monger, Bernice P. Monger and Monger Entertainment Group Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv05132
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (jtj)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order: Guidelines to Parties and Counsel Proceeding Before the Honorable Amy Totenberg. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto.To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/13/2018. (jtj)
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 PROPOSED AO 121 . (Brisbane, Latoya)
November 8, 2018 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 121. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 121. See LR 3.4. Docket the form using the event AO 121, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (eop)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Air Control Music, Inc., Boomer X Publishing, Inc., Bovina Music, Inc., Dead Game Publishing, Divine Mill Music, Fingaz Goal Music, North Avenue Music, Uh Oh Entertainment. (eop)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Bernice P. Monger. (eop)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Sampson B. Monger. (eop)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Monger Entertainment Group Inc.. (eop)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Boomer X Publishing, Inc., Bovina Music, Inc., Fingaz Goal Music, Uh Oh Entertainment, North Avenue Music, Air Control Music, Inc., Dead Game Publishing and Divine Mill Music. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8258902) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Schedule A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Air Control Music, Inc. et al v. Monger Entertainment Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Air Control Music, Inc.
Represented By: Latoya Brisbane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uh Oh Entertainment
Represented By: Latoya Brisbane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boomer X Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: Latoya Brisbane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Avenue Music
Represented By: Latoya Brisbane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bovina Music, Inc.
Represented By: Latoya Brisbane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dead Game Publishing
Represented By: Latoya Brisbane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Divine Mill Music
Represented By: Latoya Brisbane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fingaz Goal Music
Represented By: Latoya Brisbane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sampson B. Monger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernice P. Monger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monger Entertainment Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?