Fields v. The Crab Spot, Inc (Hapeville) et al

Plaintiff: Brittany Fields
Defendant: Denisha Johnson, Ricardo Lewis and The Crab Spot, Inc (Hapeville)
Case Number: 1:2018cv05225
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Default as to The Crab Spot, Inc (Hapeville). (cmd)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default by Brittany Fields. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joel B. Rothman, #2 Exhibit A)(Rothman, Joel)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Brittany Fields. The Crab Spot, Inc (Hapeville) served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018. (Rothman, Joel)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Saunders on behalf of Brittany Fields (Saunders, Amber)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (usw)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to The Crab Spot, Inc (Hapeville). (usw)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Brittany Fields. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8271548) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Paintings, #2 Exhibit 2 - Registration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Infringement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(usw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 1/11/2019 to edit filed date. (cmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fields v. The Crab Spot, Inc (Hapeville) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Fields
Represented By: Joel B. Rothman
Represented By: Amber Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denisha Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Crab Spot, Inc (Hapeville)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?