U.S. Security Associates, Inc. v. Lumby
Plaintiff: U.S. Security Associates, Inc.
Defendant: Brian Lumby and Marksman Security Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv05331
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Filing 70 CLERK'S JUDGMENT ENTERED that the action be, and the same hereby is, dismissed. (bdb)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
March 16, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (bdb)
March 16, 2020 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #69 Stipulated Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii) with Prejudice as to Brian Lumby. (bdb)
March 13, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc. (Svensson, Bianca)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 SCHEDULING ORDER re #66 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/8/2020. Discovery ends on 5/22/2020. Motions for Summary Judgment or Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/22/2020. Clerk to submit by 6/23/2020 if no MSJ or PPO filed. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/2/2020. (anc)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #62 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Austin Champion and Eric Barnum terminated. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/31/19. (TWT) Modified on 12/31/2019 to edit text (jed).
December 11, 2019 Submission of #62 MOTION to Withdraw Austin Champion and Eric L. Barnum as Attorney, to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (anc)
December 9, 2019 Filing 66 First JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc.. (Svensson, Bianca)
December 6, 2019 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Initial Disclosures by Brian Lumby.(White, Halima)
December 6, 2019 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc. (Svensson, Bianca)
November 20, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Bianca Alexandra Svensson on behalf of U.S. Security Associates, Inc. (Svensson, Bianca)
November 18, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION to Withdraw Austin Champion and Eric L. Barnum as Attorney by Brian Lumby. (White, Halima) Withdrawing attorneys corrected on 11/18/2019 (sap).
November 18, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re #62 Motion to Withdraw: Withdrawing attorneys corrected. (sap)
October 23, 2019 Filing 61 Defendant Brian Lumby's ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint by Brian Lumby. Discovery ends on 3/23/2020.(White, Halima) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 16, 2019 Filing 60 JOINT STIPULATION: Defendant Brian Lumby's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's #20 Amended Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief is due October 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 10/16/2019. (sap)
October 15, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamala S. McFadden on behalf of Brian Lumby (McFadden, Jamala)
October 15, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Halima Horton White on behalf of Brian Lumby (White, Halima)
October 9, 2019 Filing 57 STIPULATION TO EXTEND ANSWER DATE (JOINT) by Brian Lumby. (Champion, Austin)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying as moot #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/27/2019. (sap)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: Defendant Marksman Security Corporation's #30 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and Defendant Brian Lumby's #31 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/24/2019. (sap)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #52 Motion to Withdraw Porsche D. Austin as Attorney for Defendants Brian Lumby and Marksman Security Corporation. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/12/2019. (sap)
August 9, 2019 Submission of #52 MOTION to Withdraw Porsche D. Austin as Attorney to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (sap)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #51 Motion to Withdraw Dale Fresch as Counsel for Defendants Brian Lumby and Marksman Security Corporation. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/22/2019. (sap)
July 23, 2019 DOCKET ORDER GRANTING #50 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney JonVieve Hill terminated as counsel of record for U.S. Security Associates, Inc. Entered at the direction of Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/23/2019. (cmd)
July 19, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION to Withdraw Porsche D. Austin as Attorneyby Brian Lumby, Marksman Security Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Austin, Porsche)
July 12, 2019 Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Dale Fresch as Counsel for Defendants by Brian Lumby, Marksman Security Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Champion, Austin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw JonVieve Hill as Attorneyby U.S. Security Associates, Inc.. (Hill, JonVieve)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying as moot #32 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/16/2019. (sap)
May 13, 2019 Submission of #32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery and Request for an Evidentiary Hearing and #48 Status Report to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (sap)
April 29, 2019 Filing 48 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by U.S. Security Associates, Inc.. (Crawford, Matthew)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/16/2019. (sap)
April 12, 2019 Filing 46 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Brian Lumby, Marksman Security Corporation. (Champion, Austin)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER re #32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc. Discovery Motion: Parties agree to expedited discovery. USSA served requests for production to both Lumby and Marksman on March 14, 2019. Lumby and Marksman will serve objections and responses to those requests on or before Friday, March 29, 2019. Lumby and Marksman will make a good-faith effort to produce documents responsive to Plaintiff's requests-subject to any assertedobjections-on or before Friday, April 12, 2019. Injunction Motion: In view of the Parties' agreement to conduct expedited discovery, the Parties further agree to report to the Court on or before Monday, April 29, 2019, regarding the status of discovery and a proposed schedule for proceeding with any further briefing on Plaintiff's Injunction Motion: In view of the Parties' agreement to conduct expedited discovery, the Parties further agree to report to the Court on or before Monday, April 29, 2019, regarding the status of discovery and a proposed schedule for proceeding with any further briefing on Plaintiff's Injunction Motion. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/18/2019. (bdb)
March 15, 2019 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents, Electronically Stored Information and Tangible Things to Defendant Marksman Security Corporation filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc. (Crawford, Matthew)
March 15, 2019 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents, Electronically Stored Information and Tangible Things to Defendant Brian Lumby filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc. (Crawford, Matthew)
March 14, 2019 Filing 42 STIPULATION (Joint) by Brian Lumby, Marksman Security Corporation. (Champion, Austin)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER EXTENDING the Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's #32 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Expedited Discovery to March 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/11/2019. (sap)
March 11, 2019 Submission of #30 and #31 MOTIONS to Dismiss to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (sap)
March 8, 2019 Filing 40 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Crawford, Matthew)
March 7, 2019 Filing 39 Joint STIPULATION to Extend Brian Lumby and Marksman Security Corporation's Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's #32 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Expedited Discovery by Brian Lumby, Marksman Security Corporation. (Champion, Austin)
March 6, 2019 Filing 38 REPLY BRIEF re #30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Marksman Security Corporation. (Champion, Austin)
March 6, 2019 Filing 37 REPLY BRIEF re #31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Brian Lumby. (Champion, Austin)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATED ORDER extending time through 3/7/2019 for defendants to file response re #32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 2/21/2019. (ss)
February 20, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Crawford, Matthew)
February 20, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc.. (Crawford, Matthew)
February 20, 2019 Filing 33 JOINT STIPULATION to Extend Brian Lumby and Marksman Security Corporation's Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's #32 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Expedited Discovery by Brian Lumby, Marksman Security Corporation. (Champion, Austin)
February 14, 2019 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of Hearing re: NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery and Request for an Evidentiary Hearing Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (ss)
February 8, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery and Request for an Evidentiary Hearing Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. Each side is allowed one hour. (ss)
February 7, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery and Request for an Evidentiary Hearing with Brief In Support by U.S. Security Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery and Request for an Evidentiary Hearing, #2 Declaration of John McCracken, #3 Declaration of Wes Adams, #4 Declaration of Greg Freemyer, #5 Proposed Order Granting Expedited Discovery)(Crawford, Matthew)
February 6, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Brian Lumby. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Brian Lumby, #3 Exhibit A-1 - Employment Agreement, #4 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Champion, Austin)
February 6, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Marksman Security Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief Defendant Marksman Security Corporation's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Ezekiel Kaufman, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Champion, Austin)
February 5, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Marksman Security Corporation filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc. (Crawford, Matthew)
February 5, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents, Electronically Stored Information and Tangible Things to Defendant Marksman Security Corporation filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc. (Crawford, Matthew)
February 5, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Brian Lumby filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc. (Crawford, Matthew)
February 5, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents, Electronically Stored Information and Tangible Things to Defendant Brian Lumby filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc. (Crawford, Matthew)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER: Defendant Brian Lumby's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is hereby extended to February 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/24/2019. (sap)
January 23, 2019 Filing 24 Joint STIPULATION to Extend Brian Lumby's Deadline to Respond by Brian Lumby, Marksman Security Corporation. (Champion, Austin)
January 23, 2019 Remark re #23 Return of Service Executed: Service and Answer Due Date Added. (sap)
January 18, 2019 Filing 23 Return of Service Executed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc. Marksman Security Corporation served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Crawford, Matthew) Service and Answer Due Date Added on 1/23/2019 (sap).
January 15, 2019 Filing 22 Electronic Summons Issued as to Marksman Security Corporation. (sap)
January 14, 2019 Filing 21 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc. (Crawford, Matthew)
January 11, 2019 Filing 20 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brian Lumby, Marksman Security Corporation filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Crawford, Matthew) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER USSA's Emergency #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED. USSA's #3 Motion for Expedited Discovery is DENIED-IN-PART and GRANTED-IN-PART. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/19/2018. (bnp)
December 20, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re #19 Order to Attorney Austin Champion and Attorney Dale Fresch. (bnp)
December 18, 2018 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER Denying Emergency Motion for TRO and Denying In-Part and Granting In-Part Motion for Expedited Discovery. (Austin, Porsche)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #8 Application for Admission of Dale Fresch Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/14/2018. (sap)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #7 Application for Admission of Austin Champion Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/14/2018. (sap)
December 13, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Austin Champion Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8300899). Attorney Austin Champion added appearing on behalf of Brian Lumby (pmb)
December 13, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Dale Fresch Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8300968). Attorney Dale Fresch added appearing on behalf of Brian Lumby (pmb)
December 12, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Deposition of Brian Lumby by U.S. Security Associates, Inc..(Crawford, Matthew)
December 4, 2018 Filing 14 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/30/18 (Motions Hrg), before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan C. Baker, Telephone number 404-215-1558. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/26/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (pjm)
December 4, 2018 Clerks Notation re #11 Certificate of Interested Persons. OK, per TWT. (ss)
November 30, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Leroy Barnum on behalf of Brian Lumby (Barnum, Eric)
November 30, 2018 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.: MOTION HEARING held on 11/30/2018 re #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Expedited Discovery. The Court DENIED the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART the Motion for Expedited Discovery. (Court Reporter Susan Baker) (sap)
November 29, 2018 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brian Lumby. (Austin, Porsche)
November 29, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Expedited Discovery, and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Brian Lumby. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Austin, Porsche)
November 29, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Porsche D. Austin on behalf of Brian Lumby (Austin, Porsche)
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Dale Fresch Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8300968)by Brian Lumby. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Austin, Porsche)
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Austin Champion Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8300899)by Brian Lumby. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Austin, Porsche)
November 27, 2018 Refund in the amount of $400.00 has been processed, effective 11/27/2018 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
November 26, 2018 Clerks Approval re #6 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
November 26, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, and MOTION for Expedited Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2018 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (ss)
November 26, 2018 CORRECTED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, and MOTION for Expedited Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2018 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. Plaintiff's counsel directed to serve notice of hearing on defendant and/or defendant's counsel. (ss)
November 26, 2018 Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons. OK, per TWT. (ss)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number 113E-8284815. (Crawford, Matthew)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Brian Lumby. (sap)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc. (Crawford, Matthew)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 - IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED - MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Expedited Discovery, and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by U.S. Security Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Affidavit of John McCracken, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Crawford, Matthew)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Security Associates, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent US Security Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent US Security Associates Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent US Security Associates Holdings II Corp., Corporate Parent U.S. Security Associates Holding Corp., Corporate Parent USAGM Acquisition, LLC, Corporate Parent Allied Universal Holdco LLC, Corporate Parent Allied Universal Topco LLC, Corporate Parent Wendel SE, and Corporate Parent Partners Group Holding AG for U.S. Security Associates, Inc.. (Crawford, Matthew)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8284817) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (sap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Security Associates, Inc. v. Lumby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Security Associates, Inc.
Represented By: JonVieve Hill
Represented By: Matthew D. Crawford
Represented By: Bianca Alexandra Svensson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Lumby
Represented By: Austin Champion
Represented By: Dale Fresch
Represented By: Porsche D. Austin
Represented By: Eric Leroy Barnum
Represented By: Halima Horton White
Represented By: Jamala S. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marksman Security Corporation
Represented By: Austin Champion
Represented By: Porsche D. Austin
Represented By: Dale Fresch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?