Kwon et al v. Crittenden
Plaintiff: Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc., Jin Kwon and Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta
Defendant: Robyn A. Crittenden
Case Number: 1:2018cv05405
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 Consent Motion for Extension of Time through and including 2/5/19 to file and serve a detailed specification and itemization of the requested award. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 1/24/2019. (usw)
January 22, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file a detailed specification and itemization of the requested reward re: #7 Order by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Jin Kwon. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huynh, Daniel)
January 11, 2019 Submission of #12 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Notice of and Special Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (usw)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Joint Motion for Extension of Time through 1/10/19 for Plas to file motion for attorneys' fees and related nontaxable expense. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 12/21/18. (rsh)
December 20, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Notice of and Special Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs with Brief In Support by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc., Jin Kwon. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Ex. A - Declaration of Huyhn)(Huynh, Daniel)
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file a motion for attorneys fees and related nontaxable expense re: #7 Order, #10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc., Jin Kwon. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huynh, Daniel)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time. The new deadline forPlaintiffs to file a motion for attorneys fees and related nontaxable expense is December 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 12/13/18. (usw)
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc., Jin Kwon. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huynh, Daniel)
November 29, 2018 Civil Case Terminated. (rsh)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER dismissing case, as parties have resolved all pending issues by #7 Consent Order. Nothing in this Order shall affect the Courts enforcement of the consent order. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 11/29/18. (rsh)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT ORDER as to rights afforded Georgia voters by requirements of the Voting Rights Act. See Order for specific details/directives. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 11/29/18. (rsh)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE Of Filing proposed settlement by Robyn A. Crittenden (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order)(Correia, Cristina)
November 28, 2018 Clerks Notation re #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se)
November 28, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing on #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2018 at 11:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2106 before Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr.(se)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc., Jin Kwon by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc., Jin Kwon.(Huynh, Daniel)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Cristina Correia on behalf of Robyn A. Crittenden (Correia, Cristina)
November 28, 2018 Submission of #2 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED. (usw)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Robyn A. Crittenden. (usw)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Jin Kwon. IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTEDby Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Jin Kwon. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration of Grace Ahn, #3 Declaration of Jin Kwon, #4 Declaration of Karuna Ramachandran, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(usw)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jin Kwon, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8294352) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(usw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 1/3/2019 (usw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kwon et al v. Crittenden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Tang Tsui
Represented By: David Lee Gann
Represented By: Hillary Li
Represented By: Lindsay Catherine Church
Represented By: Daniel Huynh
Represented By: Brian J. Sutherland
Represented By: Phi Nguyen
Represented By: Patrick J. Flinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jin Kwon
Represented By: Nicholas Tang Tsui
Represented By: David Lee Gann
Represented By: Hillary Li
Represented By: Lindsay Catherine Church
Represented By: Daniel Huynh
Represented By: Brian J. Sutherland
Represented By: Phi Nguyen
Represented By: Patrick J. Flinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta
Represented By: Nicholas Tang Tsui
Represented By: David Lee Gann
Represented By: Hillary Li
Represented By: Lindsay Catherine Church
Represented By: Daniel Huynh
Represented By: Brian J. Sutherland
Represented By: Phi Nguyen
Represented By: Patrick J. Flinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robyn A. Crittenden
Represented By: Cristina Correia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?