Nicholson v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Plaintiff: Carlisa Nicholson
Defendant: Ethicon Incorporated and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2018cv05556
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 15 (Amended Proposed Discovery, Scheduling, and Case Management Order-Initial Discovery Pool). Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 1/17/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(btql)
January 4, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Carlisa Nicholson.(Preston, A.) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER regarding the scheduling of the depositions of plaintiffs and physicians in the Initial Discovery Pool. See Order for further details. As a result of the foregoing and with consent of counsel for the parties, Practice and Procedure Order No. 13 [Doc. No. 392] is hereby amended so as to extend each of the pending deadlines stated therein by 60 days. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/18/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(btql)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER regarding production of Ethicon PHYSIOMESH Flexible Composite Mesh exemplars. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/18/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(btql)
December 6, 2018 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:18-cv-00576. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 6, 2018 Filing 15 TRANSFER ORDER MDL No. 2782 transferring case 4:18-cv-00576-BRW to the Northern District of Georgia. Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair of the Panel on 12/6/2018. (ljb) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 12/6/2018.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 14 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 Motion to Stay,, All Proceedings Pending a Decision to Transfer to MDL No. 2782, In Re: Ethicon Physiomesh Flexible Composite Hernia Mesh Products Liability Litigation filed by Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Young, Kimberly) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 12/6/2018.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending a Decision to Transfer MDL No. 2782, In Re: Ethicon Physiomesh Flexible Composite Hernia Mesh Products Liability Litigation by Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Notice of Potential Tag-Along Actions, #2 Exhibit 2: Conditional Transfer Order 47 ("CTO-47"), #3 Exhibit 3: Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate CTO-47, #4 Exhibit 4: Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate, #5 Exhibit 5: JPML Notice of Hearing Session)(Young, Kimberly) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 12/6/2018.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Griffin, III on behalf of Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson (Griffin, William) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 12/6/2018.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson (Young, Kimberly) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 12/6/2018.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 1/29/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 2/11/2019. Jury Trial set for 10/1/2019 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 11/20/18. (mmb) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 12/6/2018.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson.(Young, Kimberly) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 12/6/2018.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ethicon Inc.(Young, Kimberly) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 12/6/2018.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Dickerson Young on behalf of Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson (Young, Kimberly) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 12/6/2018.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Carlisa Nicholson. Ethicon Inc served on 10/30/2018. (Price, Robert) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 12/6/2018.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Carlisa Nicholson. Johnson & Johnson served on 10/30/2018. (Price, Robert) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 12/6/2018.]
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #2 and #3 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, A. Renee Preston and Robert E. Price are admitted Pro Hac Vice and are directed to register for CM/ECF in the Eastern District of Arkansas by 5:00 PM, October 16, 2018. Failure to register may result in removal from this case. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/2/18. (mmb) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 12/6/2018.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Robert E. Price. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3326779. Filed by Carlisa Nicholson (Williams, David) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 12/6/2018.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Renee Preston. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3326774. Filed by Carlisa Nicholson (Williams, David) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 12/6/2018.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Carlisa Nicholson. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT068472.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 12/6/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicholson v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlisa Nicholson
Represented By: Robert E. Price
Represented By: A. Renee Preston
Represented By: David H. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Incorporated
Represented By: William M. Griffin, III
Represented By: Kimberly D. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: William M. Griffin, III
Represented By: Kimberly D. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?