United States of America v. $99,960.00 in United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $99,960.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 1:2018cv05561
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER STAYING Civil Proceedings in Light of Lapse of Appropriations. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/26/18. (rsh)
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint For Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Joseph Alexander via Attorney John M. Weiland (Brown, Michael)
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint For Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Joseph Alexander via Attorney Akil K. Secret (Brown, Michael)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint For Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Joseph Alexander via Attorney Jay Strongwater (Brown, Michael)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint For Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Joseph Alexander at USP Atlanta (Brown, Michael)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint For Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Joseph A. Alexander at home address (Brown, Michael)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed on 12/12/2018 for Warrant For Arrest In Rem. (Brown, Michael)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM by United States of America. (rjs)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): December 21, 2018 through December 27, 2018, by Michael John Brown. (Brown, Michael)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rlb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $99,960.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $99,960.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael John Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?