Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC v. Sengled USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC
Defendant: Sengled USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv05640
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (rjs)
January 7, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (rjs)
January 7, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office re #7 A.O. Form 120. (rjs)
January 7, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (rjs)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41(a) filed by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC (Dureska, Geoffrey)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons In a Civil Action, as to Ki Xu. (Ludwig, David)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (bnp)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. (bnp)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Sengled USA, Inc. (bnp)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8322032) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC v. Sengled USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sengled USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC
Represented By: David Ludwig
Represented By: Geoffrey Michael Dureska
Represented By: Louis M. Heidelberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?