Gabriel v. GS North Point, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Susan Gabriel
Defendant: Greystar Management Services, L.P., GS North Point, LLC, John Does 1-10, John Does 2-10, GREP Southeast, LLC and Greystar RS SE, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv05683
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER STAYING CASE: The Court ORDERS Defendants to file a notice indicating the citizenship of each of the members of the LLC Defendants, within twenty-one (21) days from the date of entry of this order. The Court STAYS this case as to all parties. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to resubmit this action to the undersigned after twenty-one (21) days from the date of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 12/21/2018. (rlb)
December 17, 2018 Clerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by GREP Southeast, LLC, GS North Point, LLC. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Susan Gabriel filed by GREP Southeast, LLC, GS North Point, LLC (Matthews, Zachary)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by GREP Southeast, LLC, GS North Point, LLC. (Matthews, Zachary)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by GREP Southeast, LLC and GS North Point, LLC. Discovery ends on 5/13/2019.(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against GREP Southeast, LLC and GS North Point, LLC filed by Susan Gabriel.(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by GREP Southeast, LLC and GS North Point, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-8325696) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit -B - Stipulation to Remove Case, #3 Exhibit -C - GS North Point Corps. Registration, #4 Exhibit -D - GREP Southeast Corporate Registration, #5 Exhibit -E - Notice of Filing to State Court, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gabriel v. GS North Point, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystar Management Services, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GS North Point, LLC
Represented By: Zachary Musholt Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 2-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREP Southeast, LLC
Represented By: Zachary Musholt Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystar RS SE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Gabriel
Represented By: James Elroy Douglas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?