GoClips LLC et al v. Weha LLC et al
Plaintiff: GoClips LLC and Z Keepers LLC
Defendant: Tenax USA LLC, Weha LLC and Ronald M Benton
Case Number: 1:2018cv05738
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Ronald M Benton, Tenax USA LLC, Weha LLC Answer's due 2/25/2019. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/25/2019. (btql)
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Ronald M Benton, Tenax USA LLC, Weha LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Binns, Micheal)
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Micheal Lloyd Binns on behalf of Ronald M Benton, Tenax USA LLC, Weha LLC (Binns, Micheal)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Charles G. Geitner. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 01/03/2019. (rvb)
January 2, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Charles G. Geitner Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8344447). Attorney Cammi Ryan Jones added appearing on behalf of GoClips LLC (jkm)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Charles G. Geitner Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8344447)by GoClips LLC, Z Keepers LLC. (Jones, Cammi)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (btql)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 PROPOSED AO 120 . (Jones, Cammi)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 12/19/2018. (btql)
December 19, 2018 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (usw)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Weha LLC. (usw)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Tenax USA LLC. (usw)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ronald M Benton. (usw)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by GoClips LLC, Z Keepers LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8330820). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(usw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GoClips LLC et al v. Weha LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GoClips LLC
Represented By: Cammi Ryan Jones
Represented By: Charles G. Geitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z Keepers LLC
Represented By: Cammi Ryan Jones
Represented By: Charles G. Geitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenax USA LLC
Represented By: Micheal Lloyd Binns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weha LLC
Represented By: Micheal Lloyd Binns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald M Benton
Represented By: Micheal Lloyd Binns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?