McDermott v. Stacks Publishing Group, LLC

Plaintiff: Matthew McDermott
Defendant: Stacks Publishing Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv05767
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Stacks Publishing Group, LLC. Discovery ends on 6/17/2019.(cmd) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 31, 2018 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Matthew McDermott. Stacks Publishing Group, LLC served on 12/26/2018, answer due 1/16/2019. (Rothman, Joel)
December 20, 2018 Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Matthew McDermott. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (usw)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Stacks Publishing Group, LLC. (usw)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Matthew McDermott. (usw)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Matthew McDermott with Jury Demand. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8334466) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Article, #2 Exhibit 2 - Registration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Infringement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(usw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDermott v. Stacks Publishing Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew McDermott
Represented By: Joel B. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacks Publishing Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?