Mitchell et al v. Village Capital and Investment, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Dwane Mitchell and Christin Mitchell
Defendant: Resolute Bank, James Martin Dunn, Alan Sherwood Thomas and Village Capital and Investment, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv05808
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Clarence Cooper
Referring Judge: Charles A Pannell
2 Judge: Catherine M Salinas
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 12 Electronic Summons Issued as to Alan Sherwood Thomas. (dob)
February 6, 2019 Filing 11 Electronic Summons Issued as to James Martin Dunn. (dob)
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 Electronic Summons Issued as to Resolute Bank. (dob)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Christin Mitchell, Dwane Mitchell (Goldberg, Ralph)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Christin Mitchell, Dwane Mitchell (Goldberg, Ralph)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Christin Mitchell, Dwane Mitchell (Goldberg, Ralph)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons by Christin Mitchell, Dwane Mitchell. (Goldberg, Ralph)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Village Capital and Investment, LLC. (bjh)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Christin Mitchell, Dwane Mitchell (Goldberg, Ralph)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Village Capital and Investment, LLCwith Jury Demand filed by Christin Mitchell, Dwane Mitchell.(Goldberg, Ralph) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER reassigning this case to Judge Clarence Cooper for all further proceedings. Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. has declined assignment of this case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:18-cv-5808-CC. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (ddm)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Christin Mitchell and Dwane Mitchell. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8339398) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Notice to Village, #3 Notice to Thomas, #4 Notice to Resolute Bank, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell et al v. Village Capital and Investment, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwane Mitchell
Represented By: Ralph S. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christin Mitchell
Represented By: Ralph S. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resolute Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Martin Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Sherwood Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village Capital and Investment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?