Bank of America, N.A. v. Elite Satellite Communications, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Elite Satellite Communications, Inc. and Byram D. Smith, Sr.
Case Number: 1:2018cv05836
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Elite Satellite Communications, Inc. with Brief In Support by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Default Judgment)(Washburn, Lawrence)
January 24, 2019 Clerks Entry of Default as to Elite Satellite Communications, Inc. (rlb)
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Bankruptcy Stay as to Defendant Byram D. Smith by Bank of America, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stone, Parks) Modified on 1/24/2019 to edit text (rlb).
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 Plaintiff's Request for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Elite Satellite Communications, Inc. by Bank of America, N.A.. (Stone, Parks) Modified on 1/24/2019 to edit text (rlb).
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Bank of America, N.A.. Byram D. Smith, Sr served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (Washburn, Lawrence)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Bank of America, N.A.. Elite Satellite Communications, Inc. served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (Washburn, Lawrence)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Elite Satellite Communications, Inc. and Byram D. Smith, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Summons Smith)(bdb)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Bank of America, N.A. Proposed Summons for Byram D. Smith (Washburn, Lawrence)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Bank of America, N.A. Proposed Summons for Elite Satellite Communications, Inc. (Washburn, Lawrence)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8344902) filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Elite Satellite Communication - Proposed Incomplete, #7 Summons Byram D. Smith - Proposed Incomplete, #8 Summons Byram D. Smith 2 - Proposed Incomplete, #9 Summons Elite Satellite Communication 2 - Proposed Incomplete)(rlb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Elite Satellite Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Satellite Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byram D. Smith, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Parks Kalervo Stone
Represented By: Lawrence Lee Washburn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?