Colette v. JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Plaintiff: Myrtha Colette
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2018cv05865
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Alan J Baverman
Referring Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:626
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Clerks Notation re #12 Certificate of Interested Persons Reviewed and approved by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 2/22/2019. (ecb)
February 20, 2019 Clerks Notation re #12 Certificate of Interested Persons. OK, per TWT. (ss)
February 20, 2019 Clerks Notation re #12 Certificate of Interested Persons Reviewed and approved by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 2/20/2019.(ecb)
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Shin, Gregory)
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Discovery ends on 7/19/2019.(Shin, Gregory) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 15, 2019 Remark re #10 Notice of Filing Leave of Absence. March 13-20, 2019; and March 25-29, 2019 by Shahrzad Bagheri. Judge Thrash will not require an appearance by S. Bagheri on these dates. (ss)
February 14, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re #10 Leave of Absence: Leave Dates Added. (sap)
February 13, 2019 Filing 10 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 13-15, 2019; March 18-20, 2019; and March 25-29, 2019 by Shahrzad Bagheri (Bagheri, Shahrzad) Event Corrected on 2/14/2019; Attorney Notified of Correct Event for Future Filings (sap).
February 5, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s answer due 2/19/2019. (jpa)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time through 2/19/19 for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 2/4/19. (jpa)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shin, Gregory) Event Modified on 2/5/2019 (sap).
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Young Shin on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Shin, Gregory)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Deepa N. Subramanian on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Subramanian, Deepa)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. filed by Myrtha Colette. (sap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 (FILED INCORRECTLY; SEE #5 FOR CORRECTED ENTRY) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against JP Morgan Chase & Co.with Jury Demand filed by Myrtha Colette.(Bagheri, Shahrzad) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 1/23/2019 (sap).
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Myrtha Colette. JP Morgan Chase & Co. served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019. (Bagheri, Shahrzad)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to JP Morgan Chase & Co.. (usw)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8349187) filed by Myrtha Colette. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(usw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colette v. JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Gregory Young Shin
Represented By: Deepa N. Subramanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrtha Colette
Represented By: Shahrzad Bagheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?