Office of the Fulton County District Attorney v. United States Department of Justice
Plaintiff: Office of the Fulton County District Attorney
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 1:2018cv05902
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: On January 26, 2019, the necessary legislation to resume appropriations was signed into law. The Court LIFTS the stay of this matter. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/30/2019. (rlb)
January 8, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to A. Lee Bentley, III re #9 Order on Application for Admission PHV, and as to Jason P. Mehta re #10 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jpa)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason P. Mehta. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/7/19. (jpa)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of A. Lee Bentley, III. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/7/19. (jpa)
January 7, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Jason P. Mehta Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8356974). Attorney Jason P. Mehta added appearing on behalf of Office of the Fulton County District Attorney (pmb)
January 7, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #3 APPLICATION for Admission of A. Lee Bentley, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8356925). Attorney A. Lee Bentley, III added appearing on behalf of Office of the Fulton County District Attorney (pmb)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Administrative order staying civil proceedings in light of lapse of appropriations. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/26/18. (jdb)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/2/19. (jpa)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Office of the Fulton County District Attorney. United States Department of Justice served on 12/31/2018, answer due 3/1/2019. (Rudder, Lyndsey)
December 31, 2018 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by Office of the Fulton County District Attorney. (Rudder, Lyndsey)
December 31, 2018 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Jason P. Mehta Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8356974)by Office of the Fulton County District Attorney. (Rudder, Lyndsey)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Admission of A. Lee Bentley, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8356925)by Office of the Fulton County District Attorney. (Rudder, Lyndsey)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Office of the Fulton County District Attorney. (usw)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8353961) filed by Office of the Fulton County District Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(usw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Office of the Fulton County District Attorney v. United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Office of the Fulton County District Attorney
Represented By: Lyndsey Hurst Rudder
Represented By: A. Lee Bentley, III
Represented By: Jason P. Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?