Muscarella et al v. DeCrescente et al
Plaintiff: William H. Muscarella and Patricia R. Mucarella
Defendant: A. M. DeCrescente, City of Roswell, Georgia U.S.A., Rusty Grant and Lori Henry
Case Number: 1:2018cv05909
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to William H. Muscarella re #6 Order on Motion to Expedite. (jpa)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Expedite Jury Trial. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/24/19. (jpa)
January 23, 2019 Submission of #5 MOTION to Expedite Jury Trial to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (sap)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of MOTION for Expedited Jury Trial with Memo of Points and Authority In Support by Patricia R. Mucarella and William H. Muscarella. (eop)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Rusty Grant. (eop) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (eop).
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lori Henry. (eop) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (eop).
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to A. M. DeCrescente. (eop) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (eop).
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by William H. Muscarella and Patricia R. Mucarella. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 108919) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muscarella et al v. DeCrescente et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. M. DeCrescente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Roswell, Georgia U.S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rusty Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H. Muscarella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia R. Mucarella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?