Johnson v. Direct Chassislink, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cleve Johnson
Defendant: Direct Chassislink, Inc., Consolidated Chassis Management, LLC, Norfolk Southern Corporation, Interpool, Inc., Norfolk Southern Railway Company, US 1 Logistics, LLC, South Atlantic Consolidated Chassis Pool LLC, Parsec, Inc. and Interpool, Inc. doing business as TRAC Intermodal
Case Number: 1:2019cv00108
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (rvb) (ADI)
May 27, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (rjs)
May 27, 2020 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #91 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (rjs)
May 26, 2020 Filing 91 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Cleve Johnson. (Greene, Reginald)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER: The parties are ORDERED to file a proposed consolidated pretrial order within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. The Clerk is directed to submit this matter to the undersigned if the parties fail to comply. Failure to comply will result in the dismissal of this action and/or entry of default. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 5/26/2020. (rjs)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER re #89 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Cleve Johnson, which does not bear the electronic signature or other indicia of consent of counsel for Defendant Interpool, Inc., d/b/a TracIntermodal. Further, the document suggests the consent of attorney Teddy Sutherland on behalf of Defendant Direct Chassislink, Inc. However, the Court's docket indicates that Mr. Sutherland is not counsel of record for this Defendant. The Court, therefore, DECLINES TO APPROVE the Stipulation of Dismissal. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 5/22/2020. (pdw)
May 26, 2020 Submission of #79 Order to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
May 13, 2020 Remark re #89 Stipulation of Dismissal: Stipulation cannot be entered. Attorney to refile. (rjs)
May 11, 2020 Filing 89 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Cleve Johnson. (Greene, Reginald)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (rvb) (ADI)
April 8, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Cleve Johnson (Greene, Reginald)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (mmc) (ADI)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (anc)
December 31, 2019 Filing 84 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 1/2/20, 1/7/20 - 1/8/20, 1/22/20 - 1/27/20, 2/26/20 - 2/27/20, 3/3/20 -3/5/20, 3/9/20, 4/10/20 - 4/13/20, 5/21/20 - 5/26/20, by G. Randall Moody. (Moody, G.)
December 27, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE by Cleve Johnson Leave of Absence (Greene, Reginald)
December 20, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE by Cleve Johnson re #61 Notice (Other) Supplemental Expert Disclosure (Greene, Reginald)
November 15, 2019 Filing 81 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Discovery Material by Cleve Johnson.(Greene, Reginald)
October 15, 2019 Filing 80 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE First Interrogatories of Parsec, Inc. to Plaintiff and First Request for Production of Parsec, Inc. to Plaintiff by Parsec, Inc..(Grote, Paul)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #78 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery will close on April 20, 2020. Dispositive motions will be due on May 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/30/2019. (rjs)
September 30, 2019 Filing 78 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Parsec, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Grote, Paul)
September 26, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE by Cleve Johnson Leave of Absence (Greene, Reginald)
September 16, 2019 Filing 76 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Parsec, Inc..(Grote, Paul)
September 10, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Larry Miller filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company, US 1 Logistics, LLC (Sutherland, Teddy)
September 3, 2019 Filing 74 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Initial Disclosures of Parsec, Inc. by Parsec, Inc..(Grote, Paul)
August 29, 2019 Filing 73 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by South Atlantic Consolidated Chassis Pool LLC.(Moss, Alycen)
August 28, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Cammi Ryan Jones on behalf of Direct Chassislink, Inc., Interpool, Inc. (Jones, Cammi)
August 27, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE by Consolidated Chassis Management, LLC, South Atlantic Consolidated Chassis Pool LLC of Intent to Serve Subpoena to Renzco Logistics LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Renzco Logistics LLC)(Le Jeune, Danielle)
August 19, 2019 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Cleve Johnson.(Greene, Reginald)
August 19, 2019 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Cleve Johnson by Norfolk Southern Railway Company, US 1 Logistics, LLC.(Sutherland, Teddy)
August 6, 2019 Filing 68 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Parsec, Inc. by Parsec, Inc..(Grote, Paul)
August 1, 2019 Filing 67 ANSWER to #55 Amended Complaint by Consolidated Chassis Management, LLC, South Atlantic Consolidated Chassis Pool LLC.(Moss, Alycen) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 31, 2019 Filing 66 ANSWER to #55 Amended Complaint by Parsec, Inc. (Moody, G.) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 30, 2019 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Cleve Johnson.(Greene, Reginald)
July 24, 2019 Filing 64 ANSWER to #55 Amended Complaint by Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(Sutherland, Teddy) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 24, 2019 Filing 63 ANSWER to #55 Amended Complaint by US 1 Logistics, LLC.(Sutherland, Teddy) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 23, 2019 Filing 62 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by South Atlantic Consolidated Chassis Pool LLC. South Atlantic Consolidated Chassis Pool LLC served on 7/23/2019. (Moss, Alycen)
July 19, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE by Cleve Johnson Expert Disclosure (Greene, Reginald)
July 19, 2019 Filing 60 ANSWER to #55 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Direct Chassislink, Inc., Interpool, Inc..(Lovett, Robert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 7/22/2019 to include jury demand (adg).
July 15, 2019 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Cleve Johnson.(Greene, Reginald)
July 15, 2019 Filing 58 Return of Service Executed by Cleve Johnson. Parsec, Inc. served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Greene, Reginald)
July 12, 2019 Filing 57 Electronic Summons Issued as to Parsec, Inc. (rjs)
July 11, 2019 Filing 56 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Cleve Johnson (Greene, Reginald)
July 11, 2019 Filing 55 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Consolidated Chassis Management, LLC, Direct Chassislink, Inc., Interpool, Inc., Norfolk Southern Railway Company, US 1 Logistics, LLC, Parsec, Inc., South Atlantic Consolidated Chassis Pool LLC with Jury Demand filed by Cleve Johnson.(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Motion to Add Party AS UNOPPOSED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the Amended Complaint, as attached to Plaintiff's motion as Exhibit A, as of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/11/2019. (rjs)
July 10, 2019 Submission of #53 MOTION to Add Party to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
June 20, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION to Add Party Defendant with Brief In Support by Cleve Johnson. (Greene, Reginald)
May 24, 2019 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cleve Johnson.(Greene, Reginald)
May 24, 2019 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Direct Chassislink, Inc..(Lovett, Robert)
May 21, 2019 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Consolidated Chassis Management, LLC.(Moss, Alycen)
May 20, 2019 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Norfolk Southern Railway Company, US 1 Logistics, LLC.(Sutherland, Teddy)
May 17, 2019 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Written Discovery by Interpool, Inc..(Lovett, Robert)
May 15, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE Of Filing Proof of Service on Container Port Group by Consolidated Chassis Management, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service)(Moss, Alycen)
May 13, 2019 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Supplemental Interrogatory Responses by Cleve Johnson.(Greene, Reginald)
May 1, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE by Consolidated Chassis Management, LLC of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6 to Notice of Intent)(Moss, Alycen)
April 30, 2019 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Interrogatory by Interpool, Inc. (Lovett, Robert)
April 25, 2019 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Interpool, Inc..(Lovett, Robert)
April 18, 2019 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Cleve Johnson.(Greene, Reginald)
April 17, 2019 Filing 41 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 5/27/19 - 5/31/19, 7/1/19 - 7/5/19, 10/21/19 - 10/25/19, by Reginald A. Greene. (Greene, Reginald)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SCHEDULING ORDER - Upon review of the information contained in the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan [Doc. No. #28 ], the Court orders that the time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as stated in the attached form, except as herein modified: The Court approves the parties' proposed deadlines: July 19, 2019 Deadline for Plaintiff to identify experts; September 20, 2019 Deadline for Defendants to identify experts; October 20, 2019 Deadline to identify rebuttal experts; November 20, 2019 End of discovery; December 20, 2019 Deadline to file dispositive motions (or the proposed consolidated pretrial order.) Absent extraordinary circumstances, no further extension of discovery will be permitted. If neither motion(s) for summary judgment nor the proposed pretrial order are timely filed, the Clerk is directed to submit this matter for the Court for consideration. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 4/11/2019. (tcc)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #28 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 11/20/2019. Summary Judgment Motions or Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/20/2019. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 4/11/19. (jpa)
April 5, 2019 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Cleve Johnson.(Greene, Reginald)
April 2, 2019 Filing 37 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): July 8, 2019 through and including July 22, 2019, by Teddy Lee Sutherland. (Sutherland, Teddy)
April 1, 2019 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(Stoltz, Brian)
March 27, 2019 Filing 35 Certificate of Interested Persons by US 1 Logistics, LLC. (Sutherland, Teddy)
March 27, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint by US 1 Logistics, LLC.(Sutherland, Teddy) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 27, 2019 Filing 33 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Southern Railway Company identifying Corporate Parent Norfolk Southern Company for Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Sutherland, Teddy)
March 27, 2019 Filing 32 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint by Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(Sutherland, Teddy) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 25, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE by Norfolk Southern Corporation of Withdrawal of Counsel (Adams, Hilary)
March 19, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Consolidated Chassis Management, LLC.(Le Jeune, Danielle)
March 19, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint by Consolidated Chassis Management, LLC.(Moss, Alycen) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 18, 2019 Filing 28 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Consolidated Chassis Management, LLC. (Moss, Alycen)
March 12, 2019 Filing 27 Return of Service Executed by Cleve Johnson. US 1 Logistics, LLC served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (Greene, Reginald)
March 8, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Consolidated Chassis Management, LLC.(Moss, Alycen)
March 7, 2019 Filing 25 Return of Service Executed by Cleve Johnson. Norfolk Southern Railway Company served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (Greene, Reginald)
March 6, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint by Direct Chassislink, Inc., Interpool, Inc..(Lovett, Robert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 4, 2019 Filing 23 Electronic Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (rjs)
March 4, 2019 Filing 22 Electronic Summons Issued as to US 1 Logistics, LLC. (rjs)
March 1, 2019 Filing 21 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Cleve Johnson (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Greene, Reginald)
February 26, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Consolidated Chassis Management, LLC, Direct Chassislink, Inc., Interpool, Inc., Norfolk Southern Railway Company, US 1 Logistics, LLC with Jury Demand filed by Cleve Johnson.(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Add Party and Motion to Amend AS UNOPPOSED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the Amended Complaint, as attached to Plaintiff's motion, as of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/26/2019. (rjs)
February 26, 2019 Submission of #9 MOTION to Add Party and MOTION to Amend to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
February 13, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Consolidated Chassis Management, LLC.(Moss, Alycen) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 11, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Defendant Norfolk Southern Corporation's Initial Disclosures by Norfolk Southern Corporation.(Sutherland, Teddy)
February 11, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian David Stoltz on behalf of Norfolk Southern Corporation (Stoltz, Brian)
February 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Teddy Lee Sutherland on behalf of Norfolk Southern Corporation (Sutherland, Teddy)
February 8, 2019 Filing 14 COURT'S NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES.(pdw)
February 8, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Direct Chassislink, Inc., Interpool, Inc..(Lovett, Robert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Consolidated Chassis Management, LLC Answer due 2/15/2019. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/8/2019. (rjs)
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Consolidated Chassis Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Alycen)
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 Initial Disclosures by Cleve Johnson.(Greene, Reginald)
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Add Party Defendant, MOTION to Amend Complaint with Brief In Support by Cleve Johnson. (Greene, Reginald)
January 14, 2019 Refund in the amount of $400.00 has been processed, effective 1/14/2019 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Norfolk Southern Corporation. Discovery ends on 6/10/2019.(Adams, Hilary) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Direct Chassislink, Inc. and Interpool, Inc. Answer(s) now due 2/8/2019. The parties are advised that all future joint/consent motions must be accompanied by a proposed order. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/10/2019. (pdw)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Direct Chassislink, Inc., Interpool, Inc.. (Lovett, Robert)
January 9, 2019 Clerks Approval re #2 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Consolidated Chassis Management, LLC Answer due 2/10/2019. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/9/2019. (rjs)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Consolidated Chassis Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Alycen)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Consolidated Chassis Management, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (Moss, Alycen)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Direct Chassislink, Inc., Interpool, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (Lovett, Robert)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number 113E-8366746. (Adams, Hilary)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Norfolk Southern Corporation. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-8366746) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Direct Chassislink, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct Chassislink, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Bates Lovett
Represented By: Cammi Ryan Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Chassis Management, LLC
Represented By: Danielle Corin Le Jeune
Represented By: Alycen A. Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corporation
Represented By: Hilary H. Adams
Represented By: Daryl Glenn Clarida
Represented By: Teddy Lee Sutherland
Represented By: Brian David Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interpool, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Bates Lovett
Represented By: Cammi Ryan Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Teddy Lee Sutherland
Represented By: Brian David Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US 1 Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Teddy Lee Sutherland
Represented By: Brian David Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Atlantic Consolidated Chassis Pool LLC
Represented By: Danielle Corin Le Jeune
Represented By: Alycen A. Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parsec, Inc.
Represented By: Paul A. Grote
Represented By: G. Randall Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interpool, Inc. doing business as TRAC Intermodal
Represented By: Robert Bates Lovett
Represented By: Cammi Ryan Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleve Johnson
Represented By: Reginald A. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?