Ooten et al v. Fulton County et al

Plaintiff: Rodney Ooten, Sr. and Rodney Ooten, Jr.
Defendant: Fulton County Sheriff's Department and/or Fulton County Police Department, Sergeant Henry Corey and Fulton County
Case Number: 1:2019cv00237
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw Alfred Jonathan Jackson as Attorney with Brief In Support by Henry Corey, Fulton County. (Jackson, Alfred)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Ordered by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 2/26/2019 and entered as directed by Chambers. (cmd)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond re: #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Rodney Ooten, Sr., Rodney Ooten, Jr. (Thomas, Dwight) Modified on 2/26/2019 to edit text and filer information. (cmd)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Henry Corey, Fulton County, Fulton County Sheriff's Department and/or Fulton County Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Palmer, Ashley)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Rodney Ooten, Sr, Rodney Ooten, Jr. Fulton County served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019. (Thomas, Dwight)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Rodney Ooten, Sr, Rodney Ooten, Jr. Henry Corey served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019. (Thomas, Dwight)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Rodney Ooten, Sr, Rodney Ooten, Jr. Fulton County Sheriff's Department and/or Fulton County Police Department served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019. (Thomas, Dwight)
January 15, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to James Daniel Leftwich as to Rodney Ooten, Sr. and Rodney Ooten, Jr. regarding #3 Order. (mlb)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Henry Corey, Fulton County, Fulton County Sheriff's Department and/or Fulton County Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Summons 19cv0237 Patrise M Perkins Hooker Fulton Co Attorney, #2 Summons 19cv0237 Fulton County Police Dept, #3 Summons Corey Henry)(bnw)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Rodney Ooten, Sr., Rodney Ooten, Jr.(Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8381780) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Verification Rodney Ooten, Jr., #5 Exhibit Verification Rodney Ooten, Sr.)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ooten et al v. Fulton County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulton County Sheriff's Department and/or Fulton County Police Department
Represented By: Ashley Jenell Moore Palmer
Represented By: Alfred Jonathan Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Henry Corey
Represented By: Ashley Jenell Moore Palmer
Represented By: Alfred Jonathan Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulton County
Represented By: Ashley Jenell Moore Palmer
Represented By: Alfred Jonathan Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Ooten, Sr.
Represented By: Dwight Lowell Thomas
Represented By: Taylor Leftwich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Ooten, Jr.
Represented By: Dwight Lowell Thomas
Represented By: Taylor Leftwich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?