Georgia Advocacy Office Inc. v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: Georgia Advocacy Office Inc.
Defendant: Mark Adger and Sheriff Theodore Jackson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00256
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 NOTICE: The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause. The Joint Preliminary Report shall be due on or before March 28, 2019. (rvb)
March 12, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Georgia Advocacy Office Inc.. (Orland, Devon)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Counsel are hereby ORDERED to file the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan required by Local Rule 16.2 within 14 days of entry of this Order, or SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to LR 41.3. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/8/2019. (btql)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Alfred Jonathan Jackson's #16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 03/05/2019. (rvb)
March 5, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw Alfred Jonathan Jackson as Attorney with Brief In Support by Mark Adger, Theodore Jackson. (Jackson, Alfred)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's #5 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. If Defendants again fail to comply with their statutory obligations, then Plaintiff may provide notice to the Court for consideration of a renewed motion based on new facts. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/5/2019. (btql)
February 4, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leigh Martin May: Motion Hearing held on 2/4/2019. Oral argument was held on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #5 . The Court heard from Plaintiff's and Defendants' counsel. The motion was taken under advisement. A written order will follow. (Court Reporter Montrell Vann)(btql)
February 1, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Mark Adger, Theodore Jackson. Discovery ends on 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Palmer, Ashley) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 1, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED filed by Georgia Advocacy Office Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Devon Orland)(Orland, Devon)
January 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alfred Jonathan Jackson on behalf of Mark Adger, Theodore Jackson (Jackson, Alfred)
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Jenell Moore Palmer on behalf of Mark Adger, Theodore Jackson (Palmer, Ashley)
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED filed by Mark Adger, Theodore Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Adger Affidavit, #2 Affidavit Allen Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Email from Palmer to Orland, #4 Affidavit Taylor Affidavit)(Palmer, Ashley)
January 30, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re #8 Return of Service Executed to include service and answer due date. (btql)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Georgia Advocacy Office Inc. Mark Adger served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (Orland, Devon) Text modified on 1/30/2019 to include service and answer due date (btql).
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Georgia Advocacy Office Inc.. Theodore Jackson served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (Orland, Devon)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Hearing on #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. A Motion Hearing is set for 2/4/2019 at 01:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2107 before Judge Leigh Martin May. Plaintiff is ORDERED to serve Defendants with a copy of this Order, the Complaint, and the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by close of business on Wednesday, January 23, 2019. Plaintiff should file proof of service on the docket once Defendants have been served with this Order and the pleadings. Defendants are DIRECTED to file a Response Brief on Wednesday, January 30, 2019 by 12:00 p.m. If Plaintiff is inclined to file a Reply Brief, its reply shall be due by 9:00 a.m. on Friday, February 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 01/18/2019. (rvb)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED with Brief In Support by Georgia Advocacy Office Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Orland, Devon) . Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 1/22/2019 (btql).
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 01/15/2019. (rvb)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Theodore Jackson. (btql)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Mark Adger. (btql)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Georgia Advocacy Office Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8385074) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(btql) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Georgia Advocacy Office Inc. v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Adger
Represented By: Ashley Jenell Moore Palmer
Represented By: Alfred Jonathan Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Theodore Jackson
Represented By: Ashley Jenell Moore Palmer
Represented By: Alfred Jonathan Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Advocacy Office Inc.
Represented By: Devon Orland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?