Futch v. Stone Mountain Aquisition I, LLC

Plaintiff: Thomas H. Futch
Defendant: Stone Mountain Aquisition I, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00263
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time in which Defendant may file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until March 25, 2019. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 2/6/2019. (bnp)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Combs Bender on behalf of Stone Mountain Aquisition I, LLC (Bender, Amy)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Stone Mountain Aquisition I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ackourey, Mary)
January 30, 2019 Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons - OK per WMR (sll)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by Thomas H. Futch. (Ehrlich, Craig)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Thomas H. Futch. Stone Mountain Aquisition I, LLC served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. (Ehrlich, Craig)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Stone Mountain Aquisition I, LLC. (tcc)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Thomas H. Futch. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8385355) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Futch v. Stone Mountain Aquisition I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone Mountain Aquisition I, LLC
Represented By: Mary Anne Ackourey
Represented By: Amy Combs Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas H. Futch
Represented By: Craig J. Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?