Microtel Inns and Suites Franchising, Inc. v. Micro-Hospitality Partnership et al
Plaintiff: Microtel Inns and Suites Franchising, Inc.
Defendant: Navin Patel, Dinesh N. Patel, Jayesh R. Patel, Digesh C. Patel and Micro-Hospitality Partnership
Case Number: 1:2019cv00311
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Microtel Inns and Suites Franchising, Inc.. Navin Patel served on 2/6/2019, answer due 2/27/2019. (Baker, Richard)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Microtel Inns and Suites Franchising, Inc.. Digesh C. Patel served on 2/6/2019, answer due 2/27/2019. (Baker, Richard)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Microtel Inns and Suites Franchising, Inc.. Dinesh N. Patel served on 2/4/2019, answer due 2/25/2019. (Baker, Richard)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Microtel Inns and Suites Franchising, Inc.. Jayesh R. Patel served on 2/4/2019, answer due 2/25/2019. (Baker, Richard)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Microtel Inns and Suites Franchising, Inc.. Micro-Hospitality Partnership served on 2/4/2019, answer due 2/25/2019. (Baker, Richard)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Microtel Inns and Suites Franchising, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jayesh Patel affidavit of service, #2 Affidavit Dinesh Patel affidavit of service, #3 Affidavit Digesh Patel affidavit of service, #4 Affidavit Navin Patel affidavit of service)(Baker, Richard)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/23/2019. (btql)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Navin Patel. (eop)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Digesh C. Patel. (eop)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Dinesh N. Patel. (eop)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Jayesh R. Patel. (eop)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Micro-Hospitality Partnership. (eop)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Microtel Inns and Suites Franchising, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Microtel Inns and Suites Franchising, Inc. v. Micro-Hospitality Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navin Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dinesh N. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayesh R. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digesh C. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micro-Hospitality Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Microtel Inns and Suites Franchising, Inc.
Represented By: Richard J. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?