Schwarz v. Friends of Chris Carr, Inc.

Plaintiff: Michael Schwarz
Defendant: Friends of Chris Carr, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00348
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Friends of Chris Carr, Inc.'s Answer due 3/19/2019. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 3/19/2019. (cmd)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Friends of Chris Carr, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henn, Richard)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Charles Henn, Jr on behalf of Friends of Chris Carr, Inc. (Henn, Richard)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Michael Schwarz. Friends of Chris Carr, Inc. served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Rothman, Joel)
January 25, 2019 Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Michael Schwarz. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by Michael Schwarz. (eop)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (eop)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Friends of Chris Carr, Inc.. (eop)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Michael Schwarz. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8396257) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1- Registration, #2 Exhibit -2 -Infringement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwarz v. Friends of Chris Carr, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Schwarz
Represented By: Joel B. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friends of Chris Carr, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Charles Henn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?