Caldwell v. Downs et al
Plaintiff: Leah Caldwell
Defendant: Judge Doris L. Downs and Wendy L. Shoob
Case Number: 1:2019cv00375
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Submission of #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of California to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
February 25, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of California by Leah Caldwell. (rjs)
January 23, 2019 Submission of #10 Amended Complaint for frivolity review to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-01250. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/17/2019 ORDERING the case transferred to District of Northern District of Georgia. (Washington, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/22/2019.]
January 18, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order, served on Leah Caldwell. (Washington, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/22/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Leah Caldwell. (Huang, H) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/22/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/14/18 ORDERING that #7 First Amended Complaint cannot be served as drafted and GRANTING plaintiff 30 days from the date of this order to file a second amended complaint that names defendants who are amenable to suit. (Coll, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/22/2019.]
December 14, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order served on Leah Caldwell. (Coll, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/22/2019.]
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/22/18. The court DECLINES to adopt the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS #6 and instead REFERS the matter back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings to develop the record as necessary for consideration of whether the information contained in Plaintiff's objections justifies granting further leave to amend, or whether the legal analysis supporting the findings and recommendations merely requires supplementation. (Mena-Sanchez, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/22/2019.]
August 23, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order, served on Leah Caldwell. (Mena-Sanchez, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/22/2019.]
August 14, 2017 Filing 7 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Leah Caldwell to #6 Findings and Recommendations. (Nguyen, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/22/2019.]
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action be dismissed, without prejudice, for failure to comply with the court's order and failure to name defendants who are not immune from suit signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/24/17. F&R referred to District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections to F&R due within twenty-one (21) days. (Kaminski, H) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/22/2019.]
July 25, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Findings and Recommendations, served on Leah Caldwell. (Kaminski, H) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/22/2019.]
July 19, 2017 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Leah Caldwell. (Mena-Sanchez, L) Modified on 7/24/2017 (Donati, J). [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/22/2019.]
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/20/2017 GRANTING #3 Motion to Proceed IFP and DISMISSING #1 Complaint because it names only defendants who are immune from suit. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint that names defendants who are amenable to suit and which complies with the instructions given above. (Donati, J) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/22/2019.]
June 20, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Leah Caldwell. (Donati, J) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/22/2019.]
June 16, 2017 Filing 3 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Leah Caldwell. (Kastilahn, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/22/2019.]
June 16, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Leah Caldwell. (Kastilahn, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/22/2019.]
June 16, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Doris L. Downs, Wendy L. Shoob by Leah Caldwell.(Kastilahn, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/22/2019.]
June 16, 2017 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Kastilahn, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldwell v. Downs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Doris L. Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy L. Shoob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?