Schultz Transfer Systems, Inc. v. Fleetcor Technologies Operating Company, LLC

Plaintiff: Schultz Transfer Systems, Inc.
Defendant: FleetCor Technologies Operating Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00558
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Brief In Support by FleetCor Technologies Operating Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Affidavit)(Chally, Jonathan)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #21 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Sean M. Sweeney. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 03/15/2019. (rvb)
March 15, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #21 APPLICATION for Admission of Sean M. Sweeney Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Sean Sweeney added appearing on behalf of Schultz Transfer Systems, Inc. (pmb)
March 8, 2019 Filing 21 APPLICATION for Admission of Sean M. Sweeney Pro Hac Vice with Brief In Support by Schultz Transfer Systems, Inc.. (Doss, Jason)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. FleetCor Technologies Operating Company, LLC's Answer due 4/1/2019. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/22/2019. (btql)
February 22, 2019 Clerks Notation re #18 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb)
February 21, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by FleetCor Technologies Operating Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chally, Jonathan)
February 21, 2019 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by FleetCor Technologies Operating Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent FleetCor Technologies, Inc. for FleetCor Technologies Operating Company, LLC. (Chally, Jonathan)
February 21, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan R. Chally on behalf of FleetCor Technologies Operating Company, LLC (Chally, Jonathan)
February 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Constance Barrett on behalf of FleetCor Technologies Operating Company, LLC (Barrett, Julia)
February 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by David Lewis Balser on behalf of FleetCor Technologies Operating Company, LLC (Balser, David)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Jason L. Lichtman; granting #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to David Seth Hill. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 02/19/2019. (rvb)
February 15, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #13 APPLICATION for Admission of David Seth Hill Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8443031). Attorney David Seth Hill added appearing on behalf of Schultz Transfer Systems, Inc. (pmb)
February 15, 2019 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed by Schultz Transfer Systems, Inc.. FleetCor Technologies Operating Company, LLC served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019. (Kaufman, Andrew)
February 14, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Jason L. Lichtman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8438066). Attorney Jason L. Lichtman added appearing on behalf of Schultz Transfer Systems, Inc. (pmb)
February 14, 2019 RETURN of #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Sean Sweeney Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8443006) to attorney for correction re: local counsel's address. (pmb)
February 11, 2019 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of David Seth Hill Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8443031) with Brief In Support by Schultz Transfer Systems, Inc.. (Doss, Jason)
February 11, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Sean Sweeney Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8443006) with Brief In Support by Schultz Transfer Systems, Inc.. (Doss, Jason)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew R. Kaufman; granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Jonathan D. Selbin; granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Matthew Ryan Wilson; granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Joseph Boyle, Jr. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 02/11/2019. (rvb)
February 8, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Joseph Boyle, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8431910). Attorney Michael Joseph Boyle, Jr. added appearing on behalf of Schultz Transfer Systems, Inc. (pmb)
February 8, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew Ryan Wilson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8431903). Attorney Matthew R. Wilson added appearing on behalf of Schultz Transfer Systems, Inc. (pmb)
February 8, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Jonathan D. Selbin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8431897). Attorney Jonathan D. Selbin added appearing on behalf of Schultz Transfer Systems, Inc. (pmb)
February 8, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew R. Kaufman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8431895). Attorney Andrew R. Kaufman added appearing on behalf of Schultz Transfer Systems, Inc. (pmb)
February 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address for Jason R. Doss, counsel for Schultz Transfer Systems, Inc. (Doss, Jason)
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Jason L. Lichtman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8438066) with Brief In Support by Schultz Transfer Systems, Inc.. (Doss, Jason)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/6/2019. (btql)
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Joseph Boyle, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8431910) with Brief In Support by Schultz Transfer Systems, Inc.. (Doss, Jason)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew Ryan Wilson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8431903) with Brief In Support by Schultz Transfer Systems, Inc.. (Doss, Jason)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Jonathan D. Selbin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8431897) with Brief In Support by Schultz Transfer Systems, Inc.. (Doss, Jason)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew R. Kaufman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8431895) with Brief In Support by Schultz Transfer Systems, Inc.. (Doss, Jason)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to FleetCor Technologies Operating Company, LLC. (btql)
February 4, 2019 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Schultz Transfer Systems, Inc.. (Doss, Jason)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Schultz Transfer Systems, Inc. (Doss, Jason)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Schultz Transfer Systems, Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8424605) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schultz Transfer Systems, Inc. v. Fleetcor Technologies Operating Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FleetCor Technologies Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: David Lewis Balser
Represented By: Jonathan R. Chally
Represented By: Julia Constance Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schultz Transfer Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Michael Joseph Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan D. Selbin
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Represented By: Andrew R. Kaufman
Represented By: David Seth Hill
Represented By: Sean Sweeney
Represented By: Jason L. Lichtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?