Patel et al v. Crist et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Harshad Patel and Richard Arjun Kaul, MD
Defendant: Richard Crist, Allstate Insurance Company, Office of the New Jersey Attorney General, Jane Doe (1-22), John Doe (1-22), Office of the Commissioner of the New Jersey Department of Banking and Insurance, State of New Jersey, Benjamin Hickey and Office of the Insurance Fraud Prosecutor
Case Number: 1:2019cv00612
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 29 USCA Acknowledgment of #25 Notice of Appeal filed by Harshad Patel and Richard Arjun Kaul, MD. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 19-11186-D. (pjm)
March 29, 2019 Forwarded #28 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion to Stay to USCA re: #25 Notice of Appeal filed by Harshad Patel, Richard Arjun Kaul, MD. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 00-00000-00. (kac)
March 29, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Richard Arjun Kaul, MD, Harshad Patel re #28 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion to Stay. (dob)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying #26 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying #26 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/29/2019. (dob)
March 29, 2019 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #25 Notice of Appeal. (kac)
March 29, 2019 Filing 27 USCA Appeal Transmission Letter to 11th Circuit re: #25 Notice of Appeal filed by Harshad Patel, Richard Arjun Kaul, MD. (kac)
March 29, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Reconsideration, MOTION to Stay re: #23 Order by Richard Arjun Kaul, MD, Harshad Patel. (kac)
March 27, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #23 Order by Richard Arjun Kaul, MD, Harshad Patel. Transcript Order Form due on 4/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Appeal Fee Letter, #2 Appeal Fee Letter) (IFP forms and appeal fee letters sent to Plaintiffs) (pc: USCA)(kac)
March 26, 2019 Filing 24 Letter from Dr. Harshad Patel and Richard Kaul. (dob)
March 26, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Richard Arjun Kaul, MD, Harshad Patel re #23 Order. (dob)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER finding that venue is not proper in this judicial district, venue is proper in the District of New Jersey and the interests of justice support a transfer, even through Defendant Crist does not reside in the District of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/26/2019. (dob)
March 26, 2019 New Civil Action Number in USDC NJ 3:19-cv-8946 (aar)
March 25, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Richard Arjun Kaul, MD, Harshad Patel re #22 Order. (dob)
March 25, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (dob)
March 25, 2019 Case electronically transferred to District of USDC of the District of New Jersey. (dob)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER directing the Clerk to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/25/2019. (dob)
March 15, 2019 Filing 21 Letter responding to #16 Letter filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Segel, Melissa) Modified on 3/15/2019 to edit text to reflect PDF (dob).
March 12, 2019 Filing 20 Letter to Ms. Prostusada from Dr. Harshad Patel and Richard Kaul. (dob)
March 12, 2019 Filing 19 Letter to Mr. Marra from Dr. Harshad Patel and Richard Kaul. (dob)
March 12, 2019 Filing 18 Letter to Ms. Koehler from Dr. Harshad Patel and Richard Kaul. (dob)
March 12, 2019 Filing 17 Letter to Mr. Kafarski from Dr. Harshad Patel and Richard Kaul. (dob)
March 12, 2019 Filing 16 Letter to Judge Brown from Dr. Harshad Patel and Richard Kaul. (dob)
March 12, 2019 Filing 15 Letter to Ms. Crescenza from Dr. Harshad Patel and Richard Kaul. (dob)
March 11, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Richard Arjun Kaul, MD, Harshad Patel re #14 Order. (jpa)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Stay and/or for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. The Court STAYS all deadlines in this matter for Plaintiff and all Defendants until the threshold issue of venue is resolved. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/11/19. (jpa)
March 11, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time File a Response re: #1 Complaint, Motion to Stay by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Segel, Melissa)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 Letter, dated March 5, 2019, from Dr. Harshad Patel and Richard Arjun Kaul, MD regarding service of process upon Defendant Crist. (ddm)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #9 Defendant Allstate Insurance Company's Letter to the Court filed by Richard Arjun Kaul, MD, Harshad Patel. (ddm)
March 4, 2019 Submission of the #4 Order to Show Cause to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (aaq)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa A. Segel on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (Segel, Melissa)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #4 Order to Show Cause,. (Segel, Melissa)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 Correspondence from Harshad Patel. (rlb)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Richard Arjun Kaul, MD and Harshad Patel. (rlb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/21/2019: #1 Corrected Main Document) (rlb).
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ---DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR--- STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (rlb) Modified on 2/15/2019 (rlb).
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Richard Arjun Kaul, MD and Harshad Patel.(rlb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
February 12, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Richard Arjun Kaul, MD re #4 Order to Show Cause. (rlb)
February 12, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Harshad Patel re #4 Order to Show Cause. (rlb)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff must SHOW CAUSE, on or before February 26, 2019, why venue is proper in this judicial district. Failure to do so will result in the Court dismissing this case for improper venue or transferring this case to the District of New Jersey without further notice. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 2/12/2019. (rlb)
February 8, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Richard Arjun Kaul, MD and Harshad Patel re #3 Order. (rlb)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (rlb)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Allstate Insurance Company, Richard Crist, Benjamin Hickey, Office of the Commissioner of the New Jersey Department of Banking and Insurance, Office of the Insurance Fraud Prosecutor, Office of the New Jersey Attorney General, State of New Jersey. (ddm)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Richard Arjun Kaul, MD, Harshad Patel. (Filing fee $400, receipt number GAN100109943) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 2/6/2019 to add receipt number (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel et al v. Crist et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Crist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Melissa A. Segel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the New Jersey Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe (1-22)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (1-22)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Commissioner of the New Jersey Department of Banking and Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of New Jersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Hickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Insurance Fraud Prosecutor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Harshad Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Arjun Kaul, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?