Bradford v. Perry
Petitioner: Avery Bradford
Respondent: Warden Clinton Perry
Case Number: 1:2019cv00666
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Bly
Referring Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Electronically Transferred to Middle District of Georgia re #4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (bdb)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit) by Avery Bradford. (bdb)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING this case to to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia, Athens Division, for further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 2/13/2019. (jtj)
February 13, 2019 Case transferred ELECTRONICALLY to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia, Athens Division. (jtj)
February 13, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Avery Bradford re #3 Order. (jtj)
February 13, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly terminated from case. (jtj)
February 13, 2019 New Civil Action Number in USDC MDGA 3:19-cv-0016 (aar)
February 8, 2019 Submission of #2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal and #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly for IFP determination. (bnp)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appeal by Avery Bradford. (bnp)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Avery Bradford. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradford v. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Avery Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Clinton Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?