Johnson v. Shannon et al

Plaintiff: Malik Johnson
Defendant: Monique Roscoe, CSO FNU Gilbert, Jane and/or John Doe 1-3, Gilbert Shannon and Eric Holsey
Case Number: 1:2019cv00670
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of subpoenas by Malik Johnson.(Greenamyre, Zack)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - The plaintiff's motion for pre-answer discovery [Doc. No. #7 ] is GRANTED such that the plaintiff may serve third parties subpoenas on DCS. The plaintiff's requested relief is otherwise DENIED. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 3/19/2019. (tcc)
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Gilbert Shannon. Discovery ends on 8/16/2019.(Lones, Laura) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Malik Johnson re #7 MOTION for Discovery pre-answer MOTION to Take Deposition from Department of Community Supervision MOTION tolling of statute of limitations and notification of potential parties , #8 Notice of Filing Defendants do not oppose the early discovery motions (Greenamyre, Zack)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE Of Filing Rule 27 Petition to Perpetuate Testimony by Malik Johnson (Attachments: #1 Verification)(Greenamyre, Zack)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Discovery pre-answer, MOTION to Take Deposition from Department of Community Supervision , MOTION tolling of statute of limitations and notification of potential parties with Brief In Support by Malik Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greenamyre, Zack)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Monique Roscoe, Gilbert Shannonwith Jury Demand filed by Malik Johnson.(Greenamyre, Zack) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Filipovits on behalf of Malik Johnson (Filipovits, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - The plaintiff is given 15 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint identifying which particular defendant is alleged to have committed which specific act. Failure to do so will result in this action being dismissed for failure to follow a court order. Additionally, the plaintiff refers to Jane and/or John Doe 1-3 in the caption and in paragraph 12 of the complaint. A plaintiff generally may not proceed with a claim against an unknown defendant. See Wayne v. Jarvis, 197 F.3d 1098, 1102-03 (11th Cir. 1999), overruled on other grounds by Manders v. Lee, 338 F.3d 1304, 1328 n.52 (11th Cir. 2003). Consequently, the amended complaint filed by the plaintiff should contain no reference to Jane or John Doe defendants. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 2/20/2019. (tcc)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons , as to Gilbert Shannon and Eric Holsey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Greenamyre, Zack)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to FNU Gilbert, Eric Holsey, Monique Roscoe, Gilbert Shannon. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(ddm)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Malik Johnson. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8438482) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Shannon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malik Johnson
Represented By: Zack Greenamyre
Represented By: Jeffrey Filipovits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monique Roscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSO FNU Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and/or John Doe 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert Shannon
Represented By: Laura Louise Lones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Holsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?