Elam v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jaida Elam
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc., W Hotel Management, Inc. and Robert Simpson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00719
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to State Court of Fulton County re #9 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court and #10 Remand Letter. (usw)
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 Remand Letter to Sate Court of Fulton County. (usw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2019: #1 Odyssey File and Serve) (usw).
March 29, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (usw)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Remand to State Court. The Clerk is directed to remand this action to the State Court of Fulton County and close this case. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 03/29/2019. (usw)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons and Notice of Removal (State Court) , as to Robert Simpson. (Kertscher, Douglas)
March 14, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #6 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice as to defendants Marriott International, Inc. d/b/a W Atlanta-Downtown and W Hotel Management, Inc. only pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (usw)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jaida Elam. (Kertscher, Douglas)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice As to Defendants Marriott International, Inc. d/b/a W Atlanta-Downtown and W Hotel Management, Inc. Only by Jaida Elam. (Kertscher, Douglas)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 Instructions to Parties and Counsel, signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 03/11/2019. (usw)
March 6, 2019 Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by Jaida Elam. (Kertscher, Douglas)
February 20, 2019 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marriott International, Inc., W Hotel Management, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Marriott International, Inc. for Marriott International, Inc.. (Washington, Destiny)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Marriott International, Inc., W Hotel Management, Inc.. Discovery ends on 7/19/2019.(Washington, Destiny) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by W Hotel Management, Inc. and Marriott International, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-844003) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavits of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal by Defendants Marriott Internatio, #4 Exhibit D - Copies of Process, Pleadings and Orders Served on Defendants Marriot, #5 Exhibit E - Fulton County Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit F - Affidavit of Afaf Drief, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elam v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia G. Griffith
Represented By: Destiny Smith Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Hotel Management, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia G. Griffith
Represented By: Destiny Smith Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaida Elam
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Calvert
Represented By: Douglas R. Kertscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?