Main Street Renewal v. Butler

Plaintiff: Main Street Renewal
Defendant: Corey Butler
Case Number: 1:2019cv00754
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Justin S Anand
Referring Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (usw)
March 20, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Corey Butler and Main Street Renewal re #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation and #6 Remand Letter to Magistrate Court of Newton County. (usw)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 Remand Letter to Magistrate Court of Newton County. (usw)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADOPTING #3 Final Report and Recommendation. This case is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Newton County. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 03/20/2019. (usw)
March 15, 2019 Submission of #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (usw)
February 19, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Corey Butler and Main Street Renewal re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation.(usw)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 02/15/2019. (usw)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that this action #2 Notice of Removal be REMANDED to Magistrate Court of Newton County. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 02/15/2019. (usw)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Corey Butler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(usw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER GRANTING #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 02/15/2019. c:Financial Office(usw)
February 15, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (eop)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Corey Butler. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Main Street Renewal v. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Main Street Renewal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?