BMPP Terminus LLC v. Underwood

Plaintiff: BMPP Terminus LLC
Defendant: Brian Underwood
Case Number: 1:2019cv00757
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Bly
Referring Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 Fulton County Magistrate Court filing Accepted. (rlb)
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 Case ELECTRONICALLY transmitted to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County re #6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation (STATUS: Submitting). (Attachments: #1 Remand)(rlb)
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 REMAND Letter to Clerk of Court for the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. (rlb)
April 10, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (rlb)
April 10, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to BMPP Terminus LLC and Brian Underwood re #6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (rlb)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court receives the R & R #3 with approval and adopts its findings and conclusions as the Opinion of this Court. Accordingly, Underwood's request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED, and this case is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County, Georgia. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 4/10/19. (rlb)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Brian Underwood re #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation and #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (rlb)
March 13, 2019 Submission of #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removalto District Judge William M Ray II. (rlb)
February 20, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to BMPP Terminus LLC and Brian Underwood re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (bnp)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 2/20/2019. (bnp)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 2/20/2019 within the #3 R&R. (bnp)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: RECOMMENDING that this action, #2 Notice of Removal, be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference of this matter to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 2/20/2019. (bnp)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Brian Underwood. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
February 15, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (rlb)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brian Underwood. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Petition for Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(rlb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMPP Terminus LLC v. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMPP Terminus LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?