Green v. Allergan USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tiffany Green
Defendant: John Doe's 1-2, ABC Corp., Alicia Still, Zeltiq Aesthetics, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc. and XYZ Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00797
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 23 Letter to the State Court of Fulton County regarding the remand of this action to their court. (ddm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/2/2019: #1 Envelope Receipt) (ddm).
April 2, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (ddm)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REMANDING this case to the State Court of Fulton County. The Parties shall each bear their own costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 4/2/19. (ddm)
March 20, 2019 Submission of #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, and #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Consent to Remand filed at #18 .)to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp)
March 19, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint by Alicia Still.(Mattler, Caitlin) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 19, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint by Zeltiq Aesthetics, Inc..(Mattler, Caitlin) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 19, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint by Allergan USA, Inc..(Mattler, Caitlin) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 18, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Allergan USA, Inc., Alicia Still, Zeltiq Aesthetics, Inc. Consent to Remand (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mattler, Caitlin) Modified on 3/19/2019 to add docket link(bnp).
March 18, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin Dorne Mattler on behalf of Allergan USA, Inc., Alicia Still, Zeltiq Aesthetics, Inc. (Mattler, Caitlin)
March 18, 2019 Submission of #12 MOTION to Withdraw Suzanne Lewis as Attorney to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp)
March 11, 2019 Submission of #6 MOTION to Stay Discovery to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp)
March 6, 2019 Filing 16 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against ABC Corp., Allergan USA, Inc., John Doe's 1-2, Alicia Still, XYZ Corp., Zeltiq Aesthetics, Inc.with Jury Demand filed by Tiffany Green.(Fournet, Ashley) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
March 5, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Tiffany Green. (Fournet, Ashley)
March 4, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Offer to Settle Tort Claim to Defendants filed by Tiffany Green. (Fournet, Ashley) Modified on 3/5/2019 to edit event (bnp).
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Brief In Support by Tiffany Green. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Fournet, Ashley)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw Suzanne Lewis as Attorneyby Allergan USA, Inc., Alicia Still, Zeltiq Aesthetics, Inc.. (Lewis, Suzanne)
February 22, 2019 Refund in the amount of $400.00 has been processed, effective 2/22/2019 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
February 21, 2019 Clerks Approval re #10 Application for Refund of Fees paid online, #11 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number 26FDURJ7. (Mazziotti, Thomas)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number 26FDURJ7. (Mazziotti, Thomas)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Alicia Still.(Lewis, Suzanne) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Zeltiq Aesthetics, Inc..(Lewis, Suzanne) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Allergan USA, Inc.. Discovery ends on 7/19/2019.(Lewis, Suzanne) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Discovery with Brief In Support by Allergan USA, Inc., Alicia Still, Zeltiq Aesthetics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Lewis, Suzanne)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Alicia Still. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Lewis, Suzanne)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Zeltiq Aesthetics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Lewis, Suzanne)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Allergan USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Lewis, Suzanne)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allergan USA, Inc., Alicia Still and Zeltiq Aesthetics, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate: Allergan plc for Allergan USA, Inc. and Zeltiq Aesthetics, Inc.. (eop)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 JOINT NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Zeltiq Aesthetics, Inc. and Alicia Still. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-8451875) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Allergan USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe's 1-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Still
Represented By: Thomas J. Mazziotti
Represented By: Suzanne Lewis
Represented By: Caitlin Dorne Mattler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zeltiq Aesthetics, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Mazziotti
Represented By: Suzanne Lewis
Represented By: Caitlin Dorne Mattler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Mazziotti
Represented By: Suzanne Lewis
Represented By: Caitlin Dorne Mattler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Green
Represented By: Ben C. Brodhead
Represented By: Richard Benjamin Caplan
Represented By: Ashley B. Fournet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?