Woods et al v. Prof-2013-S3 Legal Title Trust II, by US BAnd national Association, as Legal Title Trustee, by Fay Servicing, LLC
Appellant: D.J. Asante and Alice Woods
Appellee: Prof-2013-S3 Legal Title Trust II, by US Band National Association, as Legal Title Trustee, by Fay Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00858
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Alice Woods re #8 Order and #9 Clerk's Judgment (sap)
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Alice Woods re #7 Order on Motion for Reconsideration (Vacant; Unable to Forward) (sap)
April 5, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to D.J. Asante, Alice Woods re #8 Order and #9 Clerk's Judgment. (sap)
April 5, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (sap)
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing this appeal. (sap) --Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING this appeal. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/4/2019. (sap)
April 2, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to D.J. Asante, Alice Woods re #7 Order on Motion for Reconsideration. (sap)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING #5 and #6 Motions for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/2/2019. (sap)
March 25, 2019 Submission of #2 Order on Decision of Bankruptcy and #6 Amended MOTION for Reconsideration re #2 Order on Decision of Bankruptcy to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (Fee not received) (sap)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 Amended MOTION for Reconsideration re #2 Order by D.J. Asante. (sap)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Reconsideration re #2 Order by D.J. Asante. (sap)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED - DESIGNATED ITEMS NOT FILED (Lugo, Yahaira)
March 15, 2019 Filing 4 Letter to Judge re #2 Order from D.J. Asante (sap)
March 5, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to D.J. Asante, Alice Woods re #2 Order. (bdb)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER before the court for a fee determination. It appearing that the appeal is frivolous, the Appellant is ordered to pay the full filing fee within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/4/2019. (bdb) Modified to correct judge on 3/12/2019 (bdb).
February 22, 2019 Submission of #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal for Fee determination, to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (eop)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, USBC Case#: 18-68600-PMB filed by Alice Woods and D.J. Asante. Notice of Appeal filed 2/14/19 from Order entered 1/14/19 by Appellants: Alice Woods and D.J. Asante. Fee Paid: No. (Attachments: #1 Doc. 26 - NOA, #2 Doc. 21 - Order, #3 Docket Report)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods et al v. Prof-2013-S3 Legal Title Trust II, by US BAnd national Association, as Legal Title Trustee, by Fay Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: D.J. Asante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Alice Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Prof-2013-S3 Legal Title Trust II, by US Band National Association, as Legal Title Trustee, by Fay Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Andrea Hart Ippoliti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?