Fifth Third Bank v. Florida Institute of Medical Research, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Fifth Third Bank
Defendant: Florida Institute of Medical Research, Inc. and Amrish D. Patel
Case Number: 1:2019cv00926
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Florida Institute of Medical Research, Inc. and Amrish D. Patel for Sum Certain by Fifth Third Bank. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Kevin Gallagher, #2 Exhibit Term Note Loan History, #3 Exhibit First Draw Note Loan History, #4 Exhibit Second Draw Note Loan History, #5 Exhibit Term Note Payoff, #6 Exhibit First Draw Note Payoff, #7 Exhibit Second Draw Note Payoff)(Levy, Brian)
April 19, 2019 Clerks Entry of Default as to Florida Institute of Medical Research, Inc. (bnw)
April 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default Against Florida Institute of Medical Research, Inc. by Fifth Third Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration for Entry of Default)(Levy, Brian)
April 10, 2019 Clerks Entry of Default as to Amrish D. Patel (bnw)
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default Against Amrish D. Patel by Fifth Third Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration for Clerk's Entry of Default)(Levy, Brian)
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Fifth Third Bank. Florida Institute of Medical Research, Inc. served on 3/18/2019. (Levy, Brian)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Fifth Third Bank. Amrish D. Patel served on 3/18/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (Levy, Brian)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 3/6/19. (bnw)
March 1, 2019 Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC. (lwb)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fifth Third Bank identifying Corporate Parent Fifth Third Bancorp, Corporate Parent Fifth Third Financial Corporation for Fifth Third Bank. (Levy, Brian)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Amrish D. Patel. (eop)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Florida Institute of Medical Research, Inc.. (eop)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Fifth Third Bank. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8474718) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A - Term Note, #2 Exhibit -B - First Draw Note, #3 Exhibit -C - Second Draw Note, #4 Exhibit -D - Guaranty, #5 Exhibit -E - Notice of Default, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fifth Third Bank v. Florida Institute of Medical Research, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Institute of Medical Research, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amrish D. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fifth Third Bank
Represented By: Brian Joel Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?