Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. Georgia Power Company et al

Plaintiff: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Georgia Power Company and Belkin International Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00936
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #16 APPLICATION for Admission of Emma Gaddipati Pro Hac Vice. (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8574874) Attorney Charles R. Carson added appearing on behalf of Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (jkm)
April 23, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of Emma Gaddipati Pro Hac Vice by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Carson, Charles)
April 22, 2019 Filing 15 Initial Disclosures by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures)(Carson, Charles)
April 19, 2019 Filing 14 Initial Disclosures by Georgia Power Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Witness List, #2 Attachment B - Expert Witness List, #3 Attachment C - Document List and Descriptions, #4 Attachment D, #5 Attachment E - Insurance Agreement)(Kaufold-Wiggins, Malissa)
April 19, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Georgia Power Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaufold-Wiggins, Malissa)
April 12, 2019 RETURN of #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Emma Gaddipati Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8574874) to attorney for correction re: courts. (pmb)
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Emma Gaddipati Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8574874)by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Carson, Charles)
March 22, 2019 Filing 11 Instructions to Parties and Counsel, signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 03/22/2019. (usw)
March 22, 2019 Clerks Notation re #8 Certificate of Interested Persons: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se)
March 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jena Camelia Lombard on behalf of Georgia Power Company (Lombard, Jena)
March 22, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY by Georgia Power Company.(Kaufold-Wiggins, Malissa)
March 22, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Georgia Power Company identifying Corporate Parent The Southern Company for Georgia Power Company. (Kaufold-Wiggins, Malissa)
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Georgia Power Company. Discovery ends on 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rules, Regulations, and Rate Schedules for Electric Service)(Kaufold-Wiggins, Malissa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Belkin International Inc. served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019. (Carson, Charles)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Georgia Power Company served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019. (Carson, Charles)
March 1, 2019 Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (sdm)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Belkin International Inc.. (eop)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Georgia Power Company. (eop)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliates: Allstate Life Insurance Company, American Heritage Life Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Lincoln Benefit Life Company, Encompass Insurance Company of America, Encompass Indemnity Company, Allstate Assurance Company, ALIC Reinsurance Company, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Floridian Insurance Company, Allstate Life Insurance Company of New York, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate North American Insurance Company, Allstate Texas Lloyd's, Deerbrook Insurance Company, Encompass Floridian Indemnity Company, Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company, Encompass Independent Insurance Company, Encompass Insurance Company of Massachusetts, Encompass Property and Casualty Company, Encompass Property and Casualty Company of New Jersey, First Colonial Insurance Company, Intramerica Life Insurance Company, North Light Specialty Insurance Company, Surety Life Insurance Company, Allstate Floridian Indemnity Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance Company, Charter National Life Insurance Company, Encompass Floridian Insurance Company, Encompass Insurance Company of New Jersey, Encompass Insurance Company, Northbrook Indemnity Company for Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (eop)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8476198) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. Georgia Power Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles R. Carson
Represented By: Emma L. Gaddipati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Power Company
Represented By: Jena Camelia Lombard
Represented By: Malissa Anne Kaufold-Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belkin International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?