Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Buford Joes Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Cyanide Publishing, Sugarfuzz Music, Inc. and Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.
Defendant: Buford Joes Inc., George Watt and Joe
Case Number: 1:2019cv01230
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Jean-Paul Boulee
Referring Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER approving the parties' #16 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Initial disclosures shall be made no later than June 19, 2019. Discovery begins June 19, 2019, and closes on October 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Jean-Paul Boulee on 7/3/19. (ddm)
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Notice of Compliance with Local Rule 26.1 by Buford Joes Inc., George Watt.(Strickland, Andrew)
June 19, 2019 Filing 16 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Cyanide Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sugarfuzz Music, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.. (Covington, Troy)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 Initial Disclosures by Broadcast Music, Inc., Cyanide Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sugarfuzz Music, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc..(Covington, Troy)
June 18, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Jean-Paul Boulee. Judge Mark H. Cohen no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-01230-JPB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (bnw)
May 20, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Buford Joes Inc., George Watt. Discovery ends on 10/17/2019.(Strickland, Andrew) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Buford Joes Inc. Answer due 5/20/2019; George Watt Answer due 5/20/2019. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 5/14/19. (bnw)
May 13, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move Against, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Broadcast Music, Inc., Cyanide Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sugarfuzz Music, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Covington, Troy)
May 1, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Buford Joes Inc., George Watt re #11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (bnw)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Buford Joes Inc. Answer due 5/13/2019; George Watt Answer due 5/13/2019. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 5/1/19. (bnw)
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Buford Joes Inc., George Watt. (bnw)
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Broadcast Music, Inc.. George Watt served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019.. (Covington, Troy) Modified on 4/16/2019 to edit text (bnw).
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Broadcast Music, Inc. Buford Joes Inc. served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Covington, Troy) Modified on 4/16/2019 (bnw).
April 3, 2019 Clerks Notation re #7 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC. (lwb)
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc., Cyanide Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sugarfuzz Music, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for EMI Blackwood Music Inc.; Corporate Parent TEGNA Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.. (Covington, Troy)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 3/27/19. (bnw)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (bnw)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED AO 121 . (Covington, Troy)
March 25, 2019 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 121. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 121. See LR 3.4. Docket the form using the event AO 121, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (tmf)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 FILED IN ERROR Initial Disclosures by Broadcast Music, Inc., Cyanide Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sugarfuzz Music, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc..(Covington, Troy) Modified on 3/28/2019 to edit text(bnw).
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Buford Joes Inc., George Watt. (Attachments: #1 Summons George Watt)(tmf)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Songs of Universal, Inc., Cyanide Publishing, Sugarfuzz Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8518587) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Buford Joes Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buford Joes Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Garrett Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Watt
Represented By: Andrew Garrett Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe
Represented By: Andrew Garrett Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Represented By: Ryan T. Pumpian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Represented By: Ryan T. Pumpian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fuel Publishing Inc.
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Represented By: Ryan T. Pumpian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Represented By: Ryan T. Pumpian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Blackwood Music Inc.
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Represented By: Ryan T. Pumpian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyanide Publishing
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Represented By: Ryan T. Pumpian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sugarfuzz Music, Inc.
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Represented By: Ryan T. Pumpian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Represented By: Ryan T. Pumpian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?