U.S. Security Associates, Inc. v. Marini
Plaintiff: U.S. Security Associates, Inc.
Defendant: Planned Building Services, Inc., Joseph Marini and Planned Building Services, Inc. doing business as Planned Companies
Case Number: 1:2019cv01247
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Jean-Paul Boulee
Referring Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #15 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice of All Claims and Counterclaims between Plaintiff and remaining defendant Joseph Marini, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii), with each party bearing their own attorney's fees, costs, and other expenses. (ddm)
July 15, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (ddm)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of all Claims and Counterclaims Between the Plaintiff and Remaining Defendant Joseph Marini by U.S. Security Associates, Inc.. (Hill, JonVieve)
June 18, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Jean-Paul Boulee. Judge Michael L. Brown no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-1247-JPB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (jta)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER APPROVING re: #13 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court. This case is assigned to a four-month discovery track. Discovery shall be completed on or before September 23, 2019. Discovery ends on 9/23/2019. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 5/13/19. (jta)
May 9, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc., U.S. Security Associates, Inc.. (Hill, JonVieve)
May 1, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Security Associates, Inc. by U.S. Security Associates, Inc..(Crawford, Matthew) Modified on 5/2/2019 to edit text to accurately reflect e-filed document (jta).
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 9/23/2019.), COUNTERCLAIM against U.S. Security Associates, Inc. with Jury Demand by Joseph Marini.(Davis, William) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Joseph Marini Answer due 4/26/2019. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 4/15/19. (jta)
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by U.S. Security Associates, Inc.. (Crawford, Matthew) Modified on 4/12/2019 to edit text and link to existing document (jta).
April 9, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice of Defendant Planned Building Services, Inc. d/b/a Planned Companies pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (jta)
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Planned Building Services, Inc. d/b/a Planned Companies filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc. (Hill, JonVieve)
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 REDOCKETED #5 AS Return of Service Executed by Joseph Marini. Planned Building Services, Inc. served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (jta)
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 REDOCKETED #4 AS Return of Service Executed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc.. Joseph Marini served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (jta)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc. (Crawford, Matthew)
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc. (Crawford, Matthew)
March 28, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service. Incorrect event used. The Clerk has made the necessary corrections and refiled at #6 Return of Service Executed, and #7 Return of Service Executed. (jta)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Joseph Marini and Planned Building Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Planned Building Services, Inc.)(bnp)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8522989) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Security Associates, Inc. v. Marini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planned Building Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Marini
Represented By: Cary Ichter
Represented By: William Daniel Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planned Building Services, Inc. doing business as Planned Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Security Associates, Inc.
Represented By: JonVieve Hill
Represented By: Matthew D. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?