Gooch v. Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Plaintiff: Milton Gooch, III
Defendant: Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Case Number: 1:2019cv01310
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #14 Order Regarding Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan filed by Milton Gooch, III. (bnp)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #11 , #13 Preliminary Report and Discovery Plans. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a Notice with the Court WITHIN FOURTEEN DAYS OF THIS ORDER: (1) identifying specifically what documents or additional information Plaintiff contends Defendant has improperly withheld from production under FOIA; and (2) explaining in detail the basis for Plaintiff's contention that Defendant acted in bad faith in conducting an inadequate search for records in response to Plaintiff's FOIA request. Plaintiff is further DIRECTED to provide supporting documentation in Plaintiff's possession that would substantiate Plaintiff's contention that additional documents exist responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/28/2019. (bnp)
June 28, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Milton Gooch, III re #14 Order. (bnp)
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 Plaintiff's PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Milton Gooch, III. (aaq)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 Initial Disclosures filed by Milton Gooch, III.(aaq)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Manship, Flora) Modified on 5/24/2019 to edit text (bnp).
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 Initial Disclosures by Office of the Director of National Intelligence.(Manship, Flora)
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #6 Order, Certificate of Compliance with Standing Order by Flora Manship on behalf of Office of the Director of National Intelligence (Manship, Flora)
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. Discovery ends on 9/23/2019.(Manship, Flora) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
April 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE Of Filing Certificate of Compliance by Milton Gooch, III (bnp)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 4/1/2019. (bnp)
April 1, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Milton Gooch, III re #6 Order. (bnp)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Milton Gooch, III. (Attachments: #1 Return of Service Attorney General, #2 Return of Service DNI)(bnp)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to U. S. Attorney. (eop)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to U. S. Attorney General. (eop)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (eop)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Milton Gooch, III. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number GAN100111238) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gooch v. Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Gooch, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Represented By: Flora Manship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?