Singleton et al v. Petland Mall of Georgia LLC et al
Plaintiff: Katie Singleton and Dawn Singleton
Defendant: PAWsitive Solutions, Petland Mall of Georgia LLC, Solutions Pet, Kristen Parker, Debra Parker, Brad Parker, Lamar Parker and Petland, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01477
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Dawn Singleton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Worley, David)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #28 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert G. Cohen. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 7/10/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb)
July 10, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #28 APPLICATION for Admission of Robert G. Cohen Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8772925). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Robert G. Cohen added appearing on behalf of Petland, Inc. (pmb)
July 10, 2019 Clerks Notation re #29 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Petland, Inc. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
July 9, 2019 Submission of #9 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jpa)
July 3, 2019 Filing 29 Certificate of Interested Persons by Petland, Inc.. (Gretchen, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 28 APPLICATION for Admission of Robert G. Cohen Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8772925). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Petland, Inc.. (Fellows, Henry)
July 3, 2019 Filing 27 First MOTION for Oral Argument re #26 Reply to Response to Motion by Petland Mall of Georgia LLC. (Olson, David)
July 3, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Petland Mall of Georgia LLC. (Olson, David)
July 2, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction with Brief In Support by Petland, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Dale Davis)(Fellows, Henry)
July 2, 2019 Submission of #14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jpa)
July 1, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Attorney James J. Feeney as to PAWsitive Solutions regarding Order on Application for Admission PHV. (mlb)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #20 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Humberto H. Ocariz; GRANTING #21 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Giovanni Angles; and GRANTING #22 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James J. Feeney. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 7/1/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb)
July 1, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #22 APPLICATION for Admission of James J. Feeney Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8752644). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney James J. Feeney added appearing on behalf of PAWsitive Solutions (pmb)
July 1, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #21 APPLICATION for Admission of Giovanni Angles Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8752613). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Giovanni Angles added appearing on behalf of PAWsitive Solutions (pmb)
July 1, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #20 APPLICATION for Admission of Humberto H. Ocariz Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8752587). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Humberto H. Ocariz added appearing on behalf of PAWsitive Solutions (pmb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 24 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by PAWsitive Solutions identifying Other Affiliate Westfield Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Markel Insurance Company, Other Affiliate USLI Insurance Company, Other Affiliate CNA Insurance Company for PAWsitive Solutions. (Becker, Joshua)
June 28, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by PAWsitive Solutions. (Becker, Joshua)
June 25, 2019 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Admission of James J. Feeney Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8752644). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by PAWsitive Solutions. (Becker, Joshua)
June 25, 2019 Filing 21 APPLICATION for Admission of Giovanni Angles Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8752613). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by PAWsitive Solutions. (Becker, Joshua)
June 25, 2019 Filing 20 APPLICATION for Admission of Humberto H. Ocariz Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8752587). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by PAWsitive Solutions. (Becker, Joshua)
June 21, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Dawn Singleton, Katie Singleton. (Worley, David)
June 13, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry D. Fellows, Jr on behalf of Petland, Inc. (Fellows, Henry)
June 13, 2019 Filing 17 Return of Service Executed by Dawn Singleton. Petland, Inc. served on 5/24/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Worley, David)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Petland, Inc.'s Answer due 7/2/2019. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 6/12/19. (jpa)
June 12, 2019 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Petland, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gretchen, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by PAWsitive Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Becker, Joshua)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Luke Becker on behalf of PAWsitive Solutions (Becker, Joshua)
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Dawn Singleton. PAWsitive Solutions served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Worley, David)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time through 6/21/19 for plaintiffs to respond to Defendants' #9 First MOTION TO DISMISS, and teh deadline for Defendants to reply to Plaintiffs' response is extended through and including 7/22/19. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 5/22/19. (jpa)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time To File Response re: #9 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Dawn Singleton and Katie Singleton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Worley, David) Modified on 5/23/2019 to add filer (jpa).
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Brad Parker, Debra Parker, Kristen Parker, Lamar Parker, Petland Mall of Georgia LLC. (Olson, David)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Dawn Singleton. Petland Mall of Georgia LLC served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019. (Worley, David)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Dawn Singleton. Lamar Parker served on 4/30/2019, answer due 5/21/2019. (Worley, David)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Dawn Singleton. Kristen Parker served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019. (Worley, David)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Dawn Singleton. Debra Parker served on 4/30/2019, answer due 5/21/2019. (Worley, David)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Dawn Singleton. Brad Parker served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019. (Worley, David)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to PAWsitive Solutions, Brad Parker, Debra Parker, Kristen Parker, Lamar Parker, Petland Mall of Georgia LLC, Petland, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Petland, Inc., #2 Summons PAWsitive Solutions, #3 Summons Brad Parker, #4 Summons Debra Parker, #5 Summons Lamar Parker, #6 Summons Kristen Parker)(tmf)
April 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Dawn Singleton, Katie Singleton. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8552988) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singleton et al v. Petland Mall of Georgia LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAWsitive Solutions
Represented By: Giovanni Angles
Represented By: James J. Feeney
Represented By: Humberto H. Ocariz
Represented By: Joshua Luke Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petland Mall of Georgia LLC
Represented By: David A. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solutions Pet
Represented By: Giovanni Angles
Represented By: James J. Feeney
Represented By: Humberto H. Ocariz
Represented By: Joshua Luke Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Parker
Represented By: David A. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Parker
Represented By: David A. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Parker
Represented By: David A. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamar Parker
Represented By: David A. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petland, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. Cohen
Represented By: Henry D. Fellows, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Coleman Gretchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Singleton
Represented By: James M. Evangelista
Represented By: David James Worley
Represented By: Irwin Marc Ellerin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Singleton
Represented By: James M. Evangelista
Represented By: David James Worley
Represented By: Irwin Marc Ellerin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?