Jordan v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shunta Deon Jordan
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and PennyMac Loan Services, LLC,
Case Number: 1:2019cv01590
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Catherine M Salinas
Referring Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER by docket entry only GRANTING #9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant PennyMac Loan Services, LLC to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The deadline for Defendant PennyMac Loan Services, LLC to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended through 8/9/2019. SO ORDERED by United States Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 7/10/2019. (sal)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kearns, John)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement Equifax Information Services, LLC by Shunta Deon Jordan (Sieg, Paul)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER by docket entry only GRANTING #7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant PennyMac Loan Services, LLC to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The deadline for Defendant PennyMac Loan Services, LLC to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended through 7/10/2019. SO ORDERED by United States Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 6/6/2019. (sal)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kearns, John)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Kearns on behalf of PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, (Kearns, John)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth J. Campbell on behalf of PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, (Campbell, Elizabeth)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shunta Deon Jordan. Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver mailed on 4/10/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Sieg, Paul)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Shunta Deon Jordan. (Sieg, Paul)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shunta Deon Jordan. PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, waiver mailed on 4/10/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Sieg, Paul)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Shunta Deon Jordan. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8567193) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC,
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Campbell
Represented By: John Michael Kearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shunta Deon Jordan
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Berry
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Sieg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?