Lee v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Ji Hwan Lee
Defendant: Byung J. Pak, USCIS and William Barr
Case Number: 1:2019cv01609
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Clarence Cooper
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ji Hwan Lee re #7 Order. (bjh)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Petition for Writ of Mandamus, through and including August 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 7/8/19. (bjh)
July 8, 2019 Submission of #6 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Responsive Pleading, to District Judge Clarence Cooper. (bjh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Responsive Pleading with Brief In Support by William Barr, Byung J. Pak, USCIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Intent to Revoke, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jo, Y.)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Ji Hwan Lee. William Barr, Byung J. Pak and USCIS served on 4/13/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (tcc)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Byung J. Pak. (eop)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to USCIS. (eop)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to William Barr. (eop)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Mandamus Relief filed by Ji Hwan Lee. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number GAN100111689) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byung J. Pak
Represented By: Y. Soo Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS
Represented By: Y. Soo Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Y. Soo Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ji Hwan Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?