Banerjee v. McAleena et al
Plaintiff: Bijit Banerjee
Defendant: Denise Frazier, L. Francis Cissna, Kevin K. McAleena and Christopher Wray
Case Number: 1:2019cv01692
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (tmf)
June 18, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (tmf)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Bijit Banerjee (Cohen, Marshall)
April 24, 2019 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Bijit Banerjee. L. Francis Cissna served on 4/24/2019, answer due 6/24/2019; Denise Frazier served on 4/24/2019, answer due 6/24/2019; Kevin K. McAleena served on 4/24/2019, answer due 6/24/2019; Christopher Wray served on 4/24/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Cissna - executed summons, #2 Summons Wray - executed summons, #3 Summons Frazier - executed summons, #4 Summons Barr - executed summons, #5 Summons Pak - executed summons)(Cohen, Marshall)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 4/18/2019. (btql)
April 18, 2019 Filing 10 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kevin K. McAleena. (btql)
April 18, 2019 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to Denise Frazier. (btql)
April 18, 2019 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to L. Francis Cissna. (btql)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to Byung J. Pak. (eop)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to William Barr. (eop) Modified date filed on 4/17/2019 (eop).
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Christopher Wray. (eop)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 (DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR) Electronic Summons Issued as to L. Francis Cissna. (eop) Modified on 4/18/2019 (btql).
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 (DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR) Electronic Summons Issued as to Kevin K. McAleena. (eop) Modified on 4/18/2019 (btql).
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by MARSHALL LEWIS COHEN on behalf of Bijit Banerjee (eop)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Bijit Banerjee. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8589699) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Receipt Notice, #2 Exhibit -Interview Results, #3 Errata Online Case Status, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banerjee v. McAleena et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bijit Banerjee
Represented By: Marshall Lewis Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?