Burney et al v. Fulton County, Georgia et al
Plaintiff: Kevaughn Burney, Kemal Burney and Kevin Burney
Defendant: Sgt. Jessica Stewart, Detention Officer Tyana Hanks, Lt. Colonel Kirt Beasley, Wellpath LLC, Sheriff Theodore Jackson, Medical Director Meredieth Lightbourne, Unknown Jail Officer Defendants, Deputy Kisha Campbell, Nurse Franklin, Fulton County, Georgia, Unknown Jail Nurse Defendants, Booking Officer Samuel Norva, Deputy Antoinetta Bailey, Major Kenneth Walker, Deputy Ebonite Cleveland, Sgt. Cheryl Limehouse, Deputy Angelic Douglas, Lt. Colonel Derrick Singleton, Deputy Olivia Diokpara, Nurse Nwanko, Detention Captain Tyna Taylor, Colonel Mark Adger, Captain Tammy Thompson-Winfrey, Nurse Carla Spells and Detention Lt. Pearlie Young
Case Number: 1:2019cv01770
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Stay Discovery until thirty (30) days after the Fulton County Defendants file their Answers, which are due to be filed on or before July 23, 2019, or Defendants otherwise receive a ruling from this Court on any motions that they may file in response to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 6/28/19. (bjh)
June 28, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Mark Adger, Antoinetta Bailey, Kirt Beasley, Kisha Campbell, Ebonite Cleveland, Olivia Diokpara, Angelic Douglas, Fulton County, Georgia, Tyana Hanks, Theodore Jackson, Meredieth Lightbourne, Cheryl Limehouse, Samuel Norva, Derrick Singleton, Jessica Stewart, Tyna Taylor, Tammy Thompson-Winfrey, Kenneth Walker, Pearlie Young. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer, Ashley)
June 21, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by Kemal Burney, Kevaughn Burney, Kevin Burney Leave of Absence (Dominguez, Miguel)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tyana Hanks' Answer due 7/23/2019. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 6/20/19. (bjh)
June 20, 2019 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Tyana Hanks. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arrington, Michelle) Modified on 6/20/2019 to edit event type (bjh).
June 20, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Franklin.(Lavender, Thomas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 20, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Franklin. Franklin waiver mailed on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Lavender, Thomas)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Extend Rule 26 Deadline. The parties shall conduct the Early Planning Conference within 16 days of either the Fulton County Defendants' filing of their Answer or the Court's ruling on the Fulton County Defendants' motion to dismiss, and the parties shall file the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan and their respective Initial Disclosures within 30 days of either the Fulton County Defendants' filing of their Answer or the Court's ruling on the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 6/19/19. (bjh)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Mark Adger Answer due 7/23/2019; Antoinetta Bailey Answer due 7/23/2019; Kirt Beasley Answer due 7/23/2019; Kisha Campbell Answer due 7/23/2019; Ebonite Cleveland Answer due 7/23/2019; Olivia Diokpara Answer due 7/23/2019; Angelic Douglas Answer due 7/23/2019; Fulton County, Georgia Answer due 7/23/2019; Theodore Jackson Answer due 7/23/2019; Meredieth Lightbourne Answer due 7/23/2019; Cheryl Limehouse Answer due 7/23/2019; Samuel Norva Answer due 7/23/2019; Derrick Singleton Answer due 7/23/2019; Jessica Stewart Answer due 7/23/2019; Tyna Taylor Answer due 7/23/2019; Tammy Thompson-Winfrey Answer due 7/23/2019; Kenneth Walker Answer due 7/23/2019; Pearlie Young Answer due 7/23/2019. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 6/17/19. (bjh)
June 17, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time Rule 26 Deadline by Mark Adger, Antoinetta Bailey, Kirt Beasley, Kisha Campbell, Ebonite Cleveland, Olivia Diokpara, Angelic Douglas, Fulton County, Georgia, Theodore Jackson, Meredieth Lightbourne, Cheryl Limehouse, Samuel Norva, Derrick Singleton, Jessica Stewart, Tyna Taylor, Tammy Thompson-Winfrey, Kenneth Walker, Pearlie Young. (Arrington, Michelle)
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE Of Filing by Kemal Burney, Kevaughn Burney, Kevin Burney Waiver of the Service of Summons for the following Defendants: Fulton County, Georgia c/o Commissioner Liz Hausmann, Fulton County, Georgia c/o Commissioner Natalie Hall, Fulton County, Georgia c/o Commissioner Lee Morris, Fulton County, Georgia c/o Commissioner Marvin S. Arrington, Jr., Fulton County, Georgia c/o Commissioner Bob Ellis, Fulton County, Georgia c/o Commissioner Robb Pitts, Sheriff Theodore Jackson, Captain Tammy Thompson-Winfrey, Colonel Mark Adger, Medical Director Meredith Lightbourne, Detention Captain Tyna Taylor, Detention Lt. Pearlie Young, Lt. Colonel Kirt Beasley, Lt. Colonel Derrick Singleton, Major Kenneth Walker, Deputy Olivia Diokpara, Deputy Angelic Douglas, Deputy Antoinetta Bailey, Deputy Ebonite Cleveland, Sgt. Cheryl Limehouse, Sgt. Jessica Stewart, Booking Officer Samuel Norva, Deputy Kisha Campbell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Waiver of Summons - 23 Defs)(Dominguez, Miguel)
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Carla Spells.(Lavender, Thomas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Nwanko.(Lavender, Thomas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 6, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond by Mark Adger, Antoinetta Bailey, Kirt Beasley, Kisha Campbell, Ebonite Cleveland, Olivia Diokpara, Angelic Douglas, Fulton County, Georgia, Theodore Jackson, Meredieth Lightbourne, Cheryl Limehouse, Samuel Norva, Derrick Singleton, Jessica Stewart, Tyna Taylor, Tammy Thompson-Winfrey, Kenneth Walker, Pearlie Young. (Arrington, Michelle)
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Arrington on behalf of Mark Adger, Antoinetta Bailey, Kirt Beasley, Kisha Campbell, Ebonite Cleveland, Olivia Diokpara, Angelic Douglas, Fulton County, Georgia, Theodore Jackson, Meredieth Lightbourne, Cheryl Limehouse, Samuel Norva, Derrick Singleton, Jessica Stewart, Tyna Taylor, Tammy Thompson-Winfrey, Kenneth Walker, Pearlie Young (Arrington, Michelle)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Jenell Moore Palmer on behalf of Mark Adger, Antoinetta Bailey, Kirt Beasley, Kisha Campbell, Ebonite Cleveland, Olivia Diokpara, Angelic Douglas, Fulton County, Georgia, Theodore Jackson, Meredieth Lightbourne, Cheryl Limehouse, Samuel Norva, Derrick Singleton, Jessica Stewart, Tyna Taylor, Tammy Thompson-Winfrey, Kenneth Walker, Pearlie Young (Palmer, Ashley)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wellpath LLC. (Lavender, Thomas)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Wellpath LLC. Discovery ends on 11/4/2019.(Lavender, Thomas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Adrian Mendiondo. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 6/3/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dob)
June 3, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Adrian Mendiondo Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8690628). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Adrian Mendiondo added appearing on behalf of Kemal Burney, Kevaughn Burney, Kevin Burney (pmb)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Adrian Mendiondo Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8690628). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Kemal Burney, Kevaughn Burney, Kevin Burney. (Dominguez, Miguel)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Fulton County, Georgia c/o Bob Eilis. (Attachments: #1 Emma Darnell, #2 Lee Morris, #3 Liz Hausmann, #4 Marvin Arrington Jr., #5 Natalie Hall, #6 Robb Pitts)(dob)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kemal Burney, Kevaughn Burney, Kevin Burney Fulton County, Georgia c/o Commissioner Robb Pitts (Attachments: #1 Summons Fulton County, Georgia c/o Commissioner Liz Hausmann, #2 Summons Fulton County, Georgia c/o Commissioner Bob Eilis, #3 Summons Fulton County, Georgia c/o Commissioner Lee Morris, #4 Summons Fulton County, Georgia c/o Commissioner Natalie Hall, #5 Summons Fulton County, Georgia c/o Commissioner Marvin S. Arrington, Jr., #6 Summons Fulton County, Georgia c/o Commissioner Emma I. Darnell)(Dominguez, Miguel)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Kemal Burney, Kevaughn Burney, Kevin Burney re #1 Complaint, Notice of Filing Amended Exhibit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Exhibit A)(Dominguez, Miguel)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Mark Adger, Antoinetta Bailey, Kirt Beasley, Kisha Campbell, Ebonite Cleveland, Olivia Diokpara, Angelic Douglas, Franklin, Tyana Hanks, Theodore Jackson, Meredieth Lightbourne, Cheryl Limehouse, Samuel Norva, Nwanko, Derrick Singleton, Carla Spells, Jessica Stewart, Tyna Taylor, Tammy Thompson-Winfrey, Kenneth Walker, Wellpath LLC, Pearlie Young, Chris Carr. (Attachments: #1 Summons Bailey, #2 Summons Beasley, #3 Summons Campbell, #4 Summons Carr, #5 Summons Cleveland, #6 Summons Diokpara, #7 Summons Douglas, #8 Summons Franklin, #9 Summons Hanks, #10 Summons Jackson, #11 Summons Lightbourne, #12 Summons Norva, #13 Summons Nwanko, #14 Summons Singleton, #15 Summons Spells, #16 Summons Stewart, #17 Summons Taylor, #18 Summons Thompson-Winfrey, #19 Summons Walker, #20 Summons Wellpath, #21 Summons Young, #22 Summons Limehouse)(tmf)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kemal Burney, Kevin Burney, Kevaughn Burney. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8605087) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/25/2019: #2 Summons 23 Proposed summonses- incorrect) (tmf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burney et al v. Fulton County, Georgia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Jessica Stewart
Represented By: Michelle Arrington
Represented By: Ashley Jenell Moore Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detention Officer Tyana Hanks
Represented By: Michelle Arrington
Represented By: Ashley Jenell Moore Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Colonel Kirt Beasley
Represented By: Michelle Arrington
Represented By: Ashley Jenell Moore Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath LLC
Represented By: Thomas Edward Lavender, III
Represented By: Alison Lee Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Theodore Jackson
Represented By: Michelle Arrington
Represented By: Ashley Jenell Moore Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Director Meredieth Lightbourne
Represented By: Michelle Arrington
Represented By: Ashley Jenell Moore Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Jail Officer Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Kisha Campbell
Represented By: Michelle Arrington
Represented By: Ashley Jenell Moore Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Franklin
Represented By: Thomas Edward Lavender, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulton County, Georgia
Represented By: Michelle Arrington
Represented By: Ashley Jenell Moore Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Jail Nurse Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Booking Officer Samuel Norva
Represented By: Michelle Arrington
Represented By: Ashley Jenell Moore Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Antoinetta Bailey
Represented By: Michelle Arrington
Represented By: Ashley Jenell Moore Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Kenneth Walker
Represented By: Michelle Arrington
Represented By: Ashley Jenell Moore Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Ebonite Cleveland
Represented By: Michelle Arrington
Represented By: Ashley Jenell Moore Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Cheryl Limehouse
Represented By: Michelle Arrington
Represented By: Ashley Jenell Moore Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Angelic Douglas
Represented By: Michelle Arrington
Represented By: Ashley Jenell Moore Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Colonel Derrick Singleton
Represented By: Michelle Arrington
Represented By: Ashley Jenell Moore Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Olivia Diokpara
Represented By: Michelle Arrington
Represented By: Ashley Jenell Moore Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Nwanko
Represented By: Thomas Edward Lavender, III
Represented By: Alison Lee Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detention Captain Tyna Taylor
Represented By: Michelle Arrington
Represented By: Ashley Jenell Moore Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonel Mark Adger
Represented By: Michelle Arrington
Represented By: Ashley Jenell Moore Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Tammy Thompson-Winfrey
Represented By: Michelle Arrington
Represented By: Ashley Jenell Moore Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Carla Spells
Represented By: Thomas Edward Lavender, III
Represented By: Alison Lee Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detention Lt. Pearlie Young
Represented By: Michelle Arrington
Represented By: Ashley Jenell Moore Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevaughn Burney
Represented By: Miguel Angel Dominguez
Represented By: Adrian Mendiondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kemal Burney
Represented By: Miguel Angel Dominguez
Represented By: Adrian Mendiondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Burney
Represented By: Miguel Angel Dominguez
Represented By: Adrian Mendiondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?