Callahan et al v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: The Regents of the University of Michigan, Randall Callahan, Michael Wingate, Katryna Grisson, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Oregon Health & Science University, Emory University, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, Henry Ford Health System, The Washington University, University of Iowa, Indiana University Health, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, Piedmont Healthcare, University of Kentucky, Candice Seaman and Barnes-Jewish Hospital
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services and United Network for Organ Sharing
Intervenor Defendant: Susan Jackson and Charles Bennett
Case Number: 1:2019cv01783
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 128 RESPONSE re #127 Notice Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiff's Proposed Schedule for a Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by United Network for Organ Sharing, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Plaintiffs' Eleventh Circuit Reply)(Drezner, Michael) Modified on 7/3/2019 to edit text (bnp).
July 2, 2019 Submission of #114 MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Appeal to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp)
June 27, 2019 Filing 127 NOTICE of Proposed Schedule for Consideration of Preliminary Injunctive Relief Post-Kisor by Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Michael Wingate (Bunting-Graden, Jennifer) Modified on 6/28/2019 to edit event text (bnp).
June 24, 2019 Filing 126 REPLY BRIEF re #114 MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Appeal filed by United Network for Organ Sharing, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Drezner, Michael)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER by docket entry only granting #120 , #122 and #123 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 06/20/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm)
June 19, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #123 APPLICATION for Admission of Sean H. Suber Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8727386). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Sean H. Suber added appearing on behalf of United States Department of Health and Human Services (pmb)
June 19, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #122 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas G. Weber Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8727370). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Thomas G. Weber added appearing on behalf of United Network for Organ Sharing (pmb)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER by docket entry only granting #121 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Daniel D. Rubinstein. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/19/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm)
June 19, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #120 APPLICATION for Admission of Linda T. Coberly Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8727349). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Linda T. Coberly added appearing on behalf of United Network for Organ Sharing (pmb)
June 19, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #121 APPLICATION for Admission of Daniel D. Rubinstein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8727359). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Daniel D. Rubinstein added appearing on behalf of United Network for Organ Sharing (pmb)
June 17, 2019 Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: #75 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 19-11876-FF. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (kac)
June 17, 2019 Filing 125 Forthwith Request by Circuit to district court for entry of Fed.R.App.P. 11 Certification re: #75 Notice of Appeal filed by Piedmont Healthcare, University of Kentucky, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, The Washington University, Candice Seaman, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Iowa, The Regents of the University of Michigan, Michael Wingate, Indiana University Health, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Randall Callahan, Henry Ford Health System, Oregon Health & Science University, Barnes-Jewish Hospital, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 19-11876-FF. (kac)
June 14, 2019 Filing 124 RESPONSE in Opposition re #114 MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Appeal filed by Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Michael Wingate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Letter from OPTN President to Board, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Letter from HRSA to UNOS CEO)(Carrell, Courtney)
June 13, 2019 Filing 123 APPLICATION for Admission of Sean H. Suber Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8727386). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by United Network for Organ Sharing. (Caplan, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 122 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas G. Weber Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8727370). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by United Network for Organ Sharing. (Caplan, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 121 APPLICATION for Admission of Daniel D. Rubinstein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8727359). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by United Network for Organ Sharing. (Caplan, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 120 APPLICATION for Admission of Linda T. Coberly Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8727349). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by United Network for Organ Sharing. (Caplan, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting in part HHS' #115 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and granting in part UNOS' #116 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for HHS to respond to the Complaint shall be two weeks following (1) the lifting of any stay of proceedings at the District Court (in the event the Court ultimately rules that a stay is warranted); or (2) the Court's denial of Defendant HHS' motion to stay district court proceedings (whichever occurs first). Likewise, the deadline for UNOS to submit its Reply brief in support of its pending motion to dismiss shall be ten days following the occurrence of the respective trigger date as set forth above. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/13/2019. (bnp)
June 12, 2019 Filing 118 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Brandon Waddell on behalf of United Network for Organ Sharing (Waddell, Timothy)
June 12, 2019 Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Caplan on behalf of United Network for Organ Sharing (Caplan, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Filing 116 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply re: #111 Response in Opposition to Motion,, by United Network for Organ Sharing. (Flynn, Steven)
June 11, 2019 Filing 115 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint with Brief In Support by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Drezner, Michael) Modified on 6/12/2019 to edit event type (bnp).
June 11, 2019 Filing 114 MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Appeal with Brief In Support by United Network for Organ Sharing, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Eleventh Circuit Order on Expedition, #2 Exhibit 2- Motion to Expedite, #3 Exhibit 3- HHS Response to Motion to Expedite, #4 Exhibit 4- Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Expedite, #5 Exhibit 5- Plaintiffs' Eleventh Circuit Brief)(Drezner, Michael)
June 6, 2019 Filing 113 USCA Order Granting Motion to appeal pro hac vice by Motty Shulman re: #75 Notice of Appeal, filed by Piedmont Healthcare, University of Kentucky, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, The Washington University, Candice Seaman, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Iowa, The Regents of the University of Michigan, Michael Wingate, Indiana University Health, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Randall Callahan, Henry Ford Health System, Oregon Health & Science University, Barnes-Jewish Hospital, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia. Case Appealed to USCA 11th- Circuit. Case Number 19-11876-FF. (pjm)
June 6, 2019 Filing 112 USCA Order GRANTING Motion to appeal pro hac vice filed by Evelyn Neel Fruchter re: #75 Notice of Appeal, filed by Piedmont Healthcare, University of Kentucky, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, The Washington University, Candice Seaman, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Iowa, The Regents of the University of Michigan, Michael Wingate, Indiana University Health, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Randall Callahan, Henry Ford Health System, Oregon Health & Science University, Barnes-Jewish Hospital, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia. Case Appealed to USCA 11th- Circuit. Case Number 19-11876-FF. (pjm)
May 29, 2019 Filing 111 RESPONSE in Opposition re #83 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Michael Wingate. (Bunting-Graden, Jennifer)
May 28, 2019 Filing 110 Notification of Transcript Filed in District Court re: #107 Transcript Order Form filed by Piedmont Healthcare, University of Kentucky, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, The Washington University, Candice Seaman, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Iowa, The Regents of the University of Michigan, Michael Wingate, Indiana University Health, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Randall Callahan, Henry Ford Health System, Oregon Health & Science University, Barnes-Jewish Hospital, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia. All transcripts for this request are now on file. (kac)
May 28, 2019 Filing 109 Court Reporter Acknowledgment re: #107 Transcript Order Form filed by Piedmont Healthcare, University of Kentucky, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, The Washington University, Candice Seaman, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Iowa, The Regents of the University of Michigan, Michael Wingate, Indiana University Health, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Randall Callahan, Henry Ford Health System, Oregon Health & Science University, Barnes-Jewish Hospital, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. Case Number 19-11876-F. Transcript is required. Court Reporter: Shannon R. Welch. Satisfactory financial arrangements completed. Transcript due by 6/27/2019. (kac)
May 28, 2019 Filing 108 Second NOTICE Concerning NLRB Policy by United Network for Organ Sharing (Frey, Sara) Modified on 5/29/2019 to edit text(bnp).
May 28, 2019 Set Financial Arrangements due date deadline re: #107 Transcript Order Form. Financial Arrangements due on 6/11/2019.(kac)
May 28, 2019 Filing 107 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM for proceedings held on 4/24/2019, 5/7/2019, 5/13/2019, 5/20/2019 before Judge Amy Totenberg, re #75 Notice of Appeal,,,. Court Reporter: Shannon R. Welch. (Bunting-Graden, Jennifer)
May 28, 2019 Filing 106 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibit by Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Michael Wingate re #99 Evidentiary Hearing, (Bunting-Graden, Jennifer)
May 24, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE Concerning National Liver Review Board by United Network for Organ Sharing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Flynn, Steven).
May 23, 2019 Filing 104 USCA Order GRANTING Motion to Expedite #75 Notice of Appeal filed by Piedmont Healthcare, University of Kentucky, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, The Washington University, Candice Seaman, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Iowa, The Regents of the University of Michigan, Michael Wingate, Indiana University Health, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Randall Callahan, Henry Ford Health System, Oregon Health & Science University, Barnes-Jewish Hospital, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 19-11086-A. (kac)
May 23, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE by United Network for Organ Sharing Concerning Liver Allocation Policy (Frey, Sara)
May 23, 2019 Submission of #50 MOTION to Strike New Argument and Exclude Testimony to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp)
May 21, 2019 Filing 101 NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD regarding RECLAMATION AND DISPOSITION OF UNCLAIMED Documentary EXHIBITS pursuant to Local Rule 79.1D. Re: #100 Plaintiff's Exhibit. (bnp)
May 21, 2019 Filing 100 PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT 1 admitted and retained at the #99 Evidentiary Hearing. Exhibit has been received from Courtroom Deputy and placed in the custody of the Records Clerks. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Exhibit 1)(bnp)
May 20, 2019 Filing 99 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Totenberg: Evidentiary Hearing held on 5/20/2019. The Court heard evidence on Plaintiffs #85 Motion. Plaintiff exhibit 1 admitted. Bonnie Felice and Brian Shepard sworn and testified. Defendants DIRECTED to file a notice when the program is implemented. Exhibits retained by the Court to be forwarded to the Clerks Office. (Court Reporter Shannon Welch)(bnp)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #85 Motion to Show Cause and for Sanctions. Plaintiffs have properly reserved the right to renew their request for sanctions in the event of future non-compliance on Defendants part. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/20/19. (hfm)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on 5/20/2019. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/20/2019. (bnp)
May 19, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE Of Filing Witness Disclosure by Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Michael Wingate re #91 Order,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, (Bunting-Graden, Jennifer)
May 19, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE of Filing Witness List in Advance of 5/20/19 Hearing by United Network for Organ Sharing (Frey, Sara) Modified on 5/20/2019 to edit text (bnp).
May 19, 2019 Filing 93 RESPONSE in Opposition re #85 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by United Network for Organ Sharing, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Frey, Sara)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on 5/20/2019. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/17/2019. (bnp)
May 17, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE Concerning Court's May 17, 2019 Order by United States Department of Health and Human Services (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Drezner, Michael) Modified on 5/20/2019 to edit text (bnp).
May 17, 2019 CLARIFICATION NOTICE re #91 Order. The order is incorrect in stating May 21 as the hearing date. The hearing is scheduled for Monday, May 20, 2019, at 1:00 PM. (hfm)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER re Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Show Cause #85 and Defendants' Notice of Compliance Or, Alternatively, Motion for Clarification of this Court's May 15th Order #86 . The Court directs Defendants to fully comply with the Court's Order of May 15th #82 requiring Defendants to restore and maintain the pre May 14, 2019 status quo in the liver allocation policy. The Court sets an evidentiary hearing for May 20, 2019 at 1:00 pm to afford Defendants due process and an opportunity to address issues of compliance with the Court's Orders and Plaintiffs' sanctions request. See Order for details. (Evidentiary Hearing set for 5/20/2019 at 01:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2308 before Judge Amy Totenberg) Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/17/19. (hfm)
May 16, 2019 Filing 90 RESPONSE re #86 Notice (Other) of Compliance or, Alternatively, Motion for Clarification of this Court's May 15, 2019 Order filed by Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Michael Wingate. (Bunting-Graden, Jennifer)
May 16, 2019 Filing 89 RESPONSE re #86 Notice (Other) of Compliance or, Alternatively, Motion for Clarification of this Court's May 15, 2019 Order filed by Charles Bennett, Susan Jackson. (Fruchter, Evelyn)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER: The Court issues this clarifying Order to ensure the parties are placed on notice that, despite language to the contrary contained in the Court's May 13, 2019 Order, the Court does not, at this time, envision entering a further Order concerning Plaintiffs' request for emergency relief (Doc. 2), pending action on the part of the Court of Appeals. However, in the event of some unforeseen or unanticipated occurrence necessitating further Court intervention or Order on issues similar to those addressed in the Court's prior Orders, the Court will not foreclose the possibility of issuing a further pronouncement. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/16/2019. (bnp)
May 16, 2019 Filing 87 USCA Acknowledgment of #75 Notice of Appeal filed by Piedmont Healthcare, University of Kentucky, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, The Washington University, Candice Seaman, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Iowa, The Regents of the University of Michigan, Michael Wingate, Indiana University Health, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Randall Callahan, Henry Ford Health System, Oregon Health & Science University, Barnes-Jewish Hospital, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 19-11876-F. (kac)
May 16, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE by United Network for Organ Sharing, United States Department of Health and Human Services of Compliance or, Alternatively, Motion for Clarification of this Court's May 15, 2019 Order (Drezner, Michael)
May 16, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Michael Wingate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Bunting-Graden, Jennifer)
May 16, 2019 Filing 84 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference Proceedings held on 5/13/2019, before Judge Amy Totenberg. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shannon R. Welch, RMR, CRR, Telephone number 404-215-1383 shannon_welch@gand.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/17/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (srw)
May 15, 2019 Filing 83 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by United Network for Organ Sharing. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Frey, Sara)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER: The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs' motion [Doc. 76] seeking injunctive relief pending their appeal of this Court's prior Order, Defendants' briefs filed in opposition in conjunction with prevailing case law and, upon doing so, hereby GRANTS the motion. As such, Defendants are DIRECTED to immediately cease and desist from any further efforts and/or conduct aimed at continued implementation of the April 2019 liver allocation policy until further Order from the Court or otherwise until such time as the Court of Appeals has passed upon the issues raised herein. See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/15/19. (hfm)
May 14, 2019 Filing 81 Joint Brief in Opposition re #76 MOTION For Injunction Pending Appeal #74 Order on Motion for TRO, filed by Charles Bennett, Susan Jackson, United Network for Organ Sharing. (Flynn, Steven) Modified on 5/15/2019 to edit event text (bnp).
May 14, 2019 Filing 80 RESPONSE in Opposition re #76 MOTION For Injunction Pending Appeal #74 Order on Motion for TRO, filed by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Drezner, Michael)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only): On May 14, 2019, Plaintiffs filed a motion and accompanying brief pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 62(d). To the extent Defendants' plan to respond to the motion, they are to do so, if at all, by filing their opposition brief(s) on the Court's electronic docket not later than 4PM on May 14, 2019. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/14/19. (hfm)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 AMENDED ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. RE #74 Order on Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/14/2019. (bnp)
May 14, 2019 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #75 Notice of Appeal. (kac)
May 14, 2019 Filing 78 USCA Appeal Transmission Letter to 11th Circuit re: #75 Notice of Appeal filed by Piedmont Healthcare, University of Kentucky, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, he Washington University, Candice Seaman, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Iowa, The Regents of the University of Michigan, Michael Wingate, Indiana University Health, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Randall Callahan, Henry Ford Health System, Oregon Health & Science University, Barnes-Jewish Hospital, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia. (kac)
May 14, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE Concerning Liver Allocation Policy by United States Department of Health and Human Services (Drezner, Michael) Modified on 5/15/2019 to edit text(bnp).
May 14, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION For Injunction Pending Appeal #74 Order on Motion for TRO, with Brief In Support by Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Michael Wingate. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Bunting-Graden, Jennifer)
May 14, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #74 Order on Motion for TRO, by Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Michael Wingate. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AGANDC-8658242. Transcript Order Form due on 5/28/2019 (Bunting-Graden, Jennifer)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Order issued denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. 2), noting full, detailed decision to follow and that denial of immediate relief is subject to subsequent proceedings and potential legal developments. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/13/19. (hfm)
May 13, 2019 Filing 73 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Totenberg: Telephone Conference held on 5/13/2019. Written Order to follow. (Court Reporter Shannon Welch)(bnp)
May 13, 2019 Filing 72 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing Proceedings held on 5/7/2019, before Judge Amy Totenberg. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shannon R. Welch, RMR, CRR, Telephone number 404-215-1383 shannon_welch@gand.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/13/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (srw)
May 10, 2019 Filing 71 Corrected Plaintiff's RESPONSE re Order dated May 10, 2019 filed by Randall Callahan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - SRTR publication)(Canfield, Peter) Modified on 5/10/2019 to edit text (bnp).
May 10, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE Of Filing Defendants' Joint Submission as to SRTR Data by Charles Bennett, Susan Jackson, United Network for Organ Sharing, United States Department of Health and Human Services re Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Frey, Sara) Modified on 5/10/2019 to edit text (bnp).
May 10, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE Of Filing Response to the Court's May 10, 2019 Order by Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Michael Wingate re Order,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bunting-Graden, Jennifer)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only): The Court hereby DIRECTS the parties to provide it with a date certain as to when the SRTR data--relied upon by the Liver Committee in developing its two competing liver allocation proposals (i.e., B2C versus Acuity Circles)--was made available for public consumption on the OPTN website in relation to the public comment period of October 8, 2018 through November 1, 2018 (i.e., whether before, during or after the comment period). The Court FURTHER DIRECTS that the parties meet-and-confer and submit one joint stipulated response as to the same. Such a response shall be submitted by 2:30PM on May 10, 2019. However, if the the parties are not in agreement as to the date that the SRTR data was made publically available on the OPTN website, they shall submit separate responses and such responses shall be due not later than 5PM on May 10, 2019. Alternatively, if the SRTR data was provided for public consumption in a piecemeal fashion (i.e., different portions on different dates), the Court DIRECTS the parties (either jointly or otherwise as set forth above) provide it with the dates provided as well as a description (or exemplar) of the portion of the data that was provided on each respective date. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/10/19. (hfm)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting #46 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Petitioner Motty Shulman. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/9/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only): The Court has received, via the electronic docket the parties' respective filings (Docs. 66, 67, 68) concerning supplemental authority and associated exhibits. Given the overall length of each filing, the Court hereby DIRECTS that courtesy copies (specifically, two copies of each complete set of materials), compiled in a binder format with appropriate tabs, be provided forthwith. Given the short time frame involved here, these materials shall be delivered to the Court not later than close of business on May 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/8/19. (hfm)
May 8, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by United States Department of Health and Human Services (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Preamble, #2 Exhibit 2- Declaration of Joyce Somsak, #3 Exhibit 3- Liver Committee Presentation, #4 Exhibit 4- Plaintiffs' Critical Comment)(Drezner, Michael) Modified on 5/9/2019 to edit text (bnp).
May 8, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE JOINT SUBMISSION OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY AND EVIDENCE by Charles Bennett, Susan Jackson, United Network for Organ Sharing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Flynn, Steven) Modified on 5/9/2019 to edit text (bnp).
May 8, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE Of Filing Supplemental Authority Pursuant to May 7, 2019 Order by Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Michael Wingate re #63 Motion Hearing, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DOJ Brief in Kisor, #2 Exhibit Federal Advisory Committee Act, Section 5, #3 Exhibit HRSA Advisory Committees, #4 Exhibit ACOT Role, #5 Exhibit December 2018 OPTN Board Meeting Agenda, #6 Exhibit Public Comment Excel Spreadsheet Screenshot)(Bunting-Graden, Jennifer)
May 8, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL OF RECORD regarding RECLAMATION AND DISPOSITION OF UNCLAIMED Documentary EXHIBITS pursuant to Local Rule 79.1D. Re: #64 Exhibit. (bnp)
May 8, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #46 APPLICATION for Admission of Motty Shulman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8637993). Attorney Motty Shulman added appearing on behalf of Charles Bennett, Susan Jackson (pmb)
May 7, 2019 Filing 64 PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT 35 admitted and retained at the #63 Motion Hearing. Exhibit received from Courtroom Deputy and placed in the custody of the Records Clerks. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Exhibit 35)(bnp)
May 7, 2019 Filing 63 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Totenberg: Motion Hearing held on 5/7/2019. Oral argument re #2 Motion for TRO. Raymond Lynch M.D. sworn and testified. Plaintiff exhibit 35 admitted. Ryutaro Hirose M.D. sworn and testified. Supplemental authority to be submitted by 2:00pm on May 8, 2019. Exhibits retained by the Court to be forwarded to the Clerks Office. (Court Reporter Shannon Welch)(bnp)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only): The Court has reviewed the parties' Notices [Docs. 51-53] provided in response to the Court's prior Order. After doing so, the Court is not entirely clear as to the overall scope of the expert testimony that may be offered during tomorrow's hearing. As such, the Court hereby DEFERS rendering a decision on Defendant HHS' Motion to Strike New Argument and Exclude Testimony [Doc. 50] until tomorrow's hearing. Nevertheless, the Court anticipates permitting some testimony concerning irreparable harm at minimum. Turning to the proposed length of Plaintiffs' oral argument, the Court presumes that Plaintiffs will be able to present argument which totals one hour or less while reserving the remainder of such argument time for rebuttal. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/3/19. (rlb)
May 6, 2019 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Randall Callahan.(Bunting-Graden, Jennifer)
May 6, 2019 Filing 61 Certificate of Interested Persons by Charles Bennett, Susan Jackson. (Fruchter, Evelyn)
May 6, 2019 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Randall Callahan.(Krinsky, Glen)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM 2308 on May 7, 2019 for counsel of record for United States Department of Health and Human Services, Michael Drezner, Michelle Bennett, Emily Marcus Levine, Rina Hakimian, and Robert Walsh, for a hearing before Judge Amy Totenberg: 1) laptop computers and computer accessories (e.g., computer mouse, batter recharger, personal WiFi hotspots, power cords); 2) tablet computers (e.g., Apple iPad, Microsoft Surface Pro); and 3) apple watch and mobile phones, including mobile phones with cameras, (which may also operate as WiFi hotspots). Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/6/2019. (bdb)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM 2308 on May 7, 2019 for counsel of record for Intervenor-Defendants, Evelyn Fruchter and Motty Shulman for a hearing before Judge Amy Totenberg: 1) laptop computers and computer accessories (e.g., computer mouse, batter recharger, personal WiFi hotspots, power cords); 2) tablet computers (e.g., Apple iPad, Microsoft Surface Pro); and 3) apple watch and mobile phones, including mobile phones with cameras, (which may also operate as WiFi hotspots) and 4) Box containing documents. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/6/2019. (bdb)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM 2308 on May 7, 2019 for Plaintiffs, Peter Canfield, Courtney Carrell, Jennifer Bunting-Graden, Glenn Krinsky, John Majoras, and William Taylor for a hearing before Judge Amy Totenberg: 1) laptop computers and computer accessories (e.g., computer mouse, batter recharger, personal WiFi hotspots, power cords); 2) tablet computers (e.g., Apple iPad, Microsoft Surface Pro); and 3) apple watch and mobile phones, including mobile phones with cameras, (which may also operate as WiFi hotspots). Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/6/2019. (bdb)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM 2308 on May 7, 2019 before Judge Amy Totenberg for counsel of record for United Network for Organ Sharing, Steven Flynn, Jay Blumenkopf, Sara Anderson, and Jason Livingston: 1) laptop computers and computer accessories (e.g., computer mouse, batter recharger, personal WiFi hotspots, power cords); 2) tablet computers (e.g., Apple iPad, Microsoft Surface Pro); and 3) apple watch and mobile phones, including mobile phones with cameras, (which may also operate as WiFi hotspots). Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/6/2019. (bdb) Modified to add parties on 5/6/2019 (bdb).
May 6, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Tyson Parrish on behalf of Charles Bennett, Susan Jackson (Parrish, Matthew)
May 6, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Barrett Belinfante on behalf of Charles Bennett, Susan Jackson (Belinfante, Joshua)
May 6, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE by Charles Bennett, Susan Jackson, United Network for Organ Sharing Joint Notice of Defendant UNOS and Intervenor-Defendants Regarding May 7 2019 Hearing (Flynn, Steven)
May 6, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE Of Filing Response to the Court's May 2, 2019 Order by Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center re #39 Order (Bunting-Graden, Jennifer)
May 5, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE by United States Department of Health and Human Services as to Oral Argument (Drezner, Michael)
May 5, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION to Strike New Argument and Exclude Testimony with Brief In Support by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Drezner, Michael)
May 3, 2019 Filing 49 REPLY BRIEF re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Michael Wingate. (Bunting-Graden, Jennifer)
May 3, 2019 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Compliance by Sara Anderson Frey on behalf of United Network for Organ Sharing (Frey, Sara)
May 3, 2019 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Compliance by Jay S. Blumenkopf on behalf of United Network for Organ Sharing (Blumenkopf, Jay)
May 3, 2019 Filing 46 APPLICATION for Admission of Motty Shulman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8637993)by Charles Bennett, Susan Jackson. (Parrish, Matthew)
May 3, 2019 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Charles Bennett, Susan Jackson Certificate of Compliance (Fruchter, Evelyn)
May 3, 2019 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Randall Callahan.(Majoras, John)
May 3, 2019 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Randall Callahan.(Carrell, Courtney)
May 3, 2019 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Randall Callahan.(Taylor, William)
May 3, 2019 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Randall Callahan.(Canfield, Peter)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only): On May 2, 2019, Plaintiffs filed a motion requesting that they be permitted to file a combined reply brief to all three motions filed in opposition (by the Government, UNOS and the Inttervenor- Defendants). [Doc. 40]. Specifically, Plaintiffs request that they be allowed to submit a combined brief not to exceed 30 pages in length which responds to all three opposition briefs. See id. Defendants HHS and UNOS do not object and the Intervenor Defendants take no position. Having reviewed the request and finding good cause exists, Plaintiffs' motion is GRANTED. As such, Plaintiffs' combined reply brief shall not exceed 30 pages in length and shall be filed by the deadline previously directed by the Court. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/3/2019. (bnp)
May 3, 2019 Submission of #40 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only): On May 2, 2019, the Court issued an Order directing all parties to provide it with certain information in advance of the upcoming hearing on Plaintiffs' motion seeking preliminary injunctive relief. (Doc. #39 ). However, the Court unintentionally neglected to set a deadline for the submission of that information. To that end, the parties are hereby DIRECTED to supply to the Court the information in (Doc. #39 ) not later than 9AM on Monday, May 6, 2019. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/3/2019. (bnp)
May 2, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Michael Wingate. (Bunting-Graden, Jennifer)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re TRO Hearing presently scheduled for May 7, 2019, concerning Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunctive relief. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/2/2019. (bnp)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting proposed Intervenor-Defendants' #18 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/2/2019. (bnp)
May 2, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibit 13 to UNOS Brief in Opposition re #36 Response in Opposition to Motion by United Network for Organ Sharing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13 to UNOS Brief in Opposition)(Flynn, Steven) Modified on 5/2/2019 to add link to #2 motion (bnp).
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting #30 and #31 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Petitioners Jay S. Blumenkopf and Sara Anderson Frey. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/2/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm)
May 1, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by United Network for Organ Sharing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit)(Flynn, Steven)
May 1, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Charles Bennett, Susan Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Dr. Yolanda T. Becker, dated May 1, 2019, #2 Affidavit of Dr. Ryutaro Hirose, dated May 1, 2019)(Fruchter, Evelyn)
May 1, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- HRSA Letter Dated July 31, 2018, #2 Exhibit 2- Letter to Glenn Krinsky Dated April 23, 2019, #3 Exhibit 3- Executive Summary, #4 Exhibit 4- Liver Committee Briefing Paper, #5 Exhibit 5- SRTR Analysis, #6 Exhibit 6- HRSA Letter Dated December 19, 2018, #7 Exhibit 7- HRSA Letter Dated April 24, 2019, #8 Exhibit 8- SRTR Supplemental Report, #9 Exhibit 9- UNOS Letter Dated January 11, 2019, #10 Exhibit 10- Geography Comm. Minutes, #11 Exhibit 11- Lynch Article, #12 Exhibit 12- Public Comment Proposal, #13 Exhibit 13- Board Transcript, #14 Exhibit 14- Comments Submitted by Plaintiffs and/or Employees, #15 Exhibit 15- Declaration of Cheryl Dammons)(Drezner, Michael)
May 1, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #31 APPLICATION for Admission of Sara Anderson Frey Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Sara Anderson Frey added appearing on behalf of United Network for Organ Sharing (pmb)
May 1, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #30 APPLICATION for Admission of Jay S. Blumenkopf Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jay S. Blumenkopf added appearing on behalf of United Network for Organ Sharing (pmb)
May 1, 2019 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of Counsel OF COMPLIANCE by Steven J. Flynn on behalf of United Network for Organ Sharing (Flynn, Steven)
May 1, 2019 Filing 32 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Network for Organ Sharing identifying Corporate Parent United Network for Organ Sharing for United Network for Organ Sharing. (Flynn, Steven)
May 1, 2019 Filing 31 APPLICATION for Admission of Sara Anderson Frey Pro Hac Vice by United Network for Organ Sharing. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flynn, Steven)
May 1, 2019 Filing 30 APPLICATION for Admission of Jay S. Blumenkopf Pro Hac Vice by United Network for Organ Sharing. (Flynn, Steven)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The page limitation for UNOS's Brief in Opposition to the TRO Motion filed by Plaintiffs in this action is extended to a maximum of thirty-five (35) pages, exclusive of any tables or exhibits. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/1/2019. (bnp)
May 1, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE Of Filing Glossary of Terms Pursuant to the Court's April 30, 2019 Order by Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Michael Wingate re Order,,, (Bunting-Graden, Jennifer)
May 1, 2019 RETURN of #21 APPLICATION for Admission of Sara Anderson Frey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8620934) to attorney for correction re: local counsel's address. (pmb)
May 1, 2019 RETURN of #20 APPLICATION for Admission of Jay S Blumenkopf Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8620671) to attorney for correction re: local counsel's address. (pmb)
May 1, 2019 Submission of #27 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp)
April 30, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by United Network for Organ Sharing. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flynn, Steven)
April 30, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY BRIEF re #18 Emergency MOTION to Intervene filed by Charles Bennett, Susan Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fruchter, Evelyn)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only): The Court has reviewed Defendant HHS' motion, made on consent, seeking to permit HHS to file an opposition brief totaling 35 pages. [Doc. 24]. In light of the fact that no party opposes this request, HHS' motion is hereby GRANTED. HHS is therefore permitted to file a brief in opposition not exceeding 35 pages in total. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 4/30/19. (hfm)
April 30, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE Of Filing Certificate of Compliance by United States Department of Health and Human Services (Drezner, Michael)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only): Having reviewed: (1) the Complaint in this action; (2) the initial briefing concerning both Plaintiffs' motion seeking preliminary injunctive relief and; (3) the Proposed Intervenor-Defendants' motion seeking to intervene, and in light of the numerous acronyms utilized therein coupled with the upcoming hearing concerning Plaintiffs' motion, the Court would find it beneficial if Plaintiffs, as the movants, would provide it with an alphabetized listing of all names/designations with an associated acronym as well as the source for that name/designation (i.e., whether statutory, regulatory or otherwise). To that end, Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to provide the Court with this information not later than 10AM on Wednesday May 1, 2019. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 4/30/19. (hfm)
April 30, 2019 Submission of #24 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp)
April 29, 2019 Filing 24 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Drezner, Michael)
April 29, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 Emergency MOTION to Intervene filed by Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Michael Wingate. (Bunting-Graden, Jennifer)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 4/29/2019. (bnp)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting #8 , #9 , #10 , and #11 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioners John M. Majoras, William R. Taylor, Courtney Carrell, and Glenn L. Krinsky. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 4/29/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm)
April 26, 2019 Filing 21 APPLICATION for Admission of Sara Anderson Frey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8620934)by United Network for Organ Sharing. (Flynn, Steven)
April 26, 2019 Filing 20 APPLICATION for Admission of Jay S Blumenkopf Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8620671)by United Network for Organ Sharing. (Flynn, Steven)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #18 Emergency MOTION to Intervene. The Court hereby DIRECTS that the parties adhere to the following expedited briefing schedule: Plaintiffs shall submit briefs in opposition to proposed Intervenor-Defendants' Motion not later than 4PM April 29, 2019; Proposed Intervenor- Defendants may submit their reply brief (if they choose to do so) not later than 5PM May 1, 2019. (See Order for further directives.) Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 4/26/2019. (bnp)
April 26, 2019 Submission of #18 Emergency MOTION to Intervene to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp)
April 25, 2019 Filing 18 Emergency MOTION to Intervene with Brief In Support by Charles Bennett, Susan Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Emergency Motion to Intervene, #2 Declaration of E. Fruchter in Support of Emergency Motion to Intervene, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Text of Proposed Order)(Fruchter, Evelyn) Modified on 4/26/2019 to edit event text(bnp).
April 25, 2019 Filing 17 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference Proceedings held on 4/24/2019, before Judge Amy Totenberg. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shannon R. Welch, RMR, CRR, Telephone number 404-215-1383, shannon_welch@gand.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/16/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (srw)
April 25, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Glenn L. Krinsky Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8611885). Attorney Glenn Lorin Krinsky added appearing on behalf of Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Michael Wingate (pmb)
April 25, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Courtney Carrell Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8611852). Attorney Courtney Carrell added appearing on behalf of Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Michael Wingate (pmb)
April 25, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of William R. Taylor Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8611851). Attorney William Roquemore Taylor added appearing on behalf of Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Michael Wingate (pmb)
April 25, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of John M. Majoras Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8611850). Attorney John M. Majoras added appearing on behalf of Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Michael Wingate (pmb)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the Parties proposed briefing schedulewhich is predicated on a revised liver allocation policy implementation date of May 14, 2019for Plaintiffs Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. [Doc. 15]. Having done so, and in view of the Courts concern as to those matters previously pending on its calendar, the Court hereby DIRECTS that the parties abide by the following modified schedule: May 1, 2019: Defendants shall submit briefs in opposition to Plaintiffs Motion; May 3, 2019: Plaintiffs shall submit their reply brief; May 7, 2019: The Court shall conduct a hearing on the motion to begin at 9:30AM in Courtroom 2308. (See Order for further directives) Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 4/24/19. (hfm)
April 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by United States Department of Health and Human Services Re: Proposed Schedule (Drezner, Michael)
April 24, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Totenberg: Telephone Conference held on 4/24/2019. The parties are to consult and advise the Court by 4:30 PM if they are able to come to a scheduling agreement. (Court Reporter Shannon Welch)(bnp)
April 24, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Flynn on behalf of United Network for Organ Sharing (Flynn, Steven)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part #12 Motion for Leave to Participate. Mr. Shulman will be allowed to listen to but not participate in the teleconference. The Court will recognize Mr. Shulman and allow a brief statement towards the end of the teleconference. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 4/24/19. (hfm)
April 24, 2019 Submission of #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Participate in Telephonic Conference to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp)
April 24, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Participate in Telephonic Conference by Susan Jackson, Charles Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Letter from Boswell to Azar), #2 Exhibit 2 (Letter from Shulman to Krinsky))(Fruchter, Evelyn)
April 23, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Glenn L. Krinsky Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8611885)by Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Michael Wingate. (Bunting-Graden, Jennifer)
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Courtney Carrell Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8611852)by Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Michael Wingate. (Bunting-Graden, Jennifer)
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of William R. Taylor Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8611851)by Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Michael Wingate. (Bunting-Graden, Jennifer)
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of John M. Majoras Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8611850)by Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Michael Wingate. (Bunting-Graden, Jennifer)
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notification of Lawsuit Pursuant to Court Order , as to Defendants United States Department of Health and Human Services and United Network for Organ Sharing. (Bunting-Graden, Jennifer)
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Michael Wingate identifying Corporate Parent BJC Health System d/b/a BJC HealthCare for Barnes-Jewish Hospital; Corporate Parent Saint Luke's Health System for Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City. (Bunting-Graden, Jennifer)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by The Regents of the University of Michigan, Candice Seaman, Piedmont Healthcare, Henry Ford Health System, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Oregon Health & Science University, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, University of Iowa, Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Indiana University Health, Katryna Grisson, University of Kentucky, Michael Wingate, The Washington University. United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 4/23/2019, answer due 5/14/2019. (Bunting-Graden, Jennifer)
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Drezner on behalf of United States Department of Health and Human Services (Drezner, Michael)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only): On April 22, 2019, Plaintiffs filed the instant Complaint and motion seeking a Temporary Restraining Order [Docs. 1, 2] concerning the April 30, 2019 implementation of a liver transplant policy by Defendants. As an initial matter, the Court hereby DIRECTS Plaintiffs to confirm that proper service has been effected upon both Defendant U.S. Department of Health and Human Services and Defendant United Network for Organ Sharing as well as whether the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Northern District Georgia has been properly notified of this lawsuit. Moreover, in light of the gravity of the issues raised in Plaintiffs' motion papers and given the imminency of the policy's implementation date, the Court further DIRECTS that all parties be available to attend a telephonic conference to convene on April 24, 2019 at 12:00PM. The conference line information for dialing in to this call will be provided under separate cover. Finally, in light of the fact that no appearance has yet been made on behalf of Defendants, the Court DIRECTS that Plaintiffs' counsel immediately provide a copy of this Minute Order to Defendants by email and overnight mail and provide proof of such service on the Court's electronic docket promptly. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 4/23/19. (hfm)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to United Network for Organ Sharing and United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Summons United Network for Organ Sharing)(bnp)
April 23, 2019 Submission of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order with Brief In Support by Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Michael Wingate. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Text of Proposed Order)(bnp)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8608843) filed by The Regents of the University of Michigan, Candice Seaman, Piedmont Healthcare, Henry Ford Health System, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Oregon Health & Science University, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, University of Iowa, Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, Indiana University Health, Katryna Grisson, University of Kentucky, Michael Wingate, The Washington University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Callahan et al v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Regents of the University of Michigan
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: Peter Crane Canfield
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Represented By: Courtney Carrell
Represented By: Glen Krinsky
Represented By: Courtney A Carrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Callahan
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: Peter Crane Canfield
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Represented By: Courtney Carrell
Represented By: Glen Krinsky
Represented By: Courtney A Carrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wingate
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: Peter Crane Canfield
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Represented By: Courtney Carrell
Represented By: Glen Krinsky
Represented By: Courtney A Carrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katryna Grisson
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: Peter Crane Canfield
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Represented By: Courtney Carrell
Represented By: Glen Krinsky
Represented By: Courtney A Carrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: Peter Crane Canfield
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Represented By: Courtney Carrell
Represented By: Glen Krinsky
Represented By: Courtney A Carrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oregon Health & Science University
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: Peter Crane Canfield
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Represented By: Courtney Carrell
Represented By: Glen Krinsky
Represented By: Courtney A Carrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emory University
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: Peter Crane Canfield
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Represented By: Courtney Carrell
Represented By: Glen Krinsky
Represented By: Courtney A Carrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: Peter Crane Canfield
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Represented By: Courtney Carrell
Represented By: Glen Krinsky
Represented By: Courtney A Carrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Ford Health System
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: Peter Crane Canfield
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Represented By: Courtney Carrell
Represented By: Glen Krinsky
Represented By: Courtney A Carrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Washington University
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: Peter Crane Canfield
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Represented By: Courtney Carrell
Represented By: Glen Krinsky
Represented By: Courtney A Carrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University of Iowa
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: Peter Crane Canfield
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Represented By: Courtney Carrell
Represented By: Glen Krinsky
Represented By: Courtney A Carrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana University Health
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: Peter Crane Canfield
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Represented By: Courtney Carrell
Represented By: Glen Krinsky
Represented By: Courtney A Carrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: Peter Crane Canfield
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Represented By: Courtney Carrell
Represented By: Glen Krinsky
Represented By: Courtney A Carrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanderbilt University Medical Center
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: Peter Crane Canfield
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Represented By: Courtney Carrell
Represented By: Glen Krinsky
Represented By: Courtney A Carrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University of Kansas Hospital Authority
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: Peter Crane Canfield
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Represented By: Courtney Carrell
Represented By: Glen Krinsky
Represented By: Courtney A Carrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Piedmont Healthcare
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: Peter Crane Canfield
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Represented By: Courtney Carrell
Represented By: Glen Krinsky
Represented By: Courtney A Carrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University of Kentucky
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: Peter Crane Canfield
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Represented By: Courtney Carrell
Represented By: Glen Krinsky
Represented By: Courtney A Carrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candice Seaman
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: Peter Crane Canfield
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Represented By: Courtney Carrell
Represented By: Glen Krinsky
Represented By: Courtney A Carrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barnes-Jewish Hospital
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: Peter Crane Canfield
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Represented By: Courtney Carrell
Represented By: Glen Krinsky
Represented By: Courtney A Carrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Susan Jackson
Represented By: Evelyn Neel Fruchter
Represented By: Joshua Barrett Belinfante
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Matthew Tyson Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Charles Bennett
Represented By: Evelyn Neel Fruchter
Represented By: Joshua Barrett Belinfante
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Matthew Tyson Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Network for Organ Sharing
Represented By: Steven J. Flynn
Represented By: Thomas G. Weber
Represented By: Sara Anderson Frey
Represented By: Linda T. Coberly
Represented By: Sean H. Suber
Represented By: Jay S. Blumenkopf
Represented By: Michael A. Caplan
Represented By: Daniel D. Rubinstein
Represented By: Timothy Brandon Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?