Clark v. Parsec, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Elaine Clark
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company, PARSEC INC, Budco Group, Inc., XYZ CORP, XYZ Corp. Nos. 1-21 and Parsec, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01925
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 First Initial Disclosures by Elaine Clark.(Hilt, Matthew)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 Initial Disclosures by Parsec, Inc..(Moody, G.)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #11 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery in this matter will conclude on October 13, 2019. Any motions for summary judgment or the proposed consolidated pretrial order must be filed on or before November 12, 2019. If a motion for summary judgment is filed, the proposed consolidated pretrial order must be filed within 30 days after this Court's ruling thereon. If neither motion(s) for summary judgment nor the proposed pretrial order are timely filed, the Clerk is directed to submit this matter for the Court for consideration. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 6/24/2019. (rjs)
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by PARSEC INC. (Moody, G.)
June 11, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendants Budco Group, Inc. and Norfolk Southern Railway pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (jkl)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendants Budco Group, Inc. and Norfolk Southern Railway filed by Elaine Clark (Hilt, Matthew)
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 Court's Notice Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES.(pdw)
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 5:19-cv-00130. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 30, 2019 Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Georgia Northern. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 5/14/2019. (vs) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 4/30/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Consent Motion to Transfer Case. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to TRANSFER the case to the Northern District of Georgia. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 4/29/2019. (kat) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 4/30/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT MOTION to Transfer Case by BUDCO GROUP INC, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, PARSEC INC filed by PAUL A GROTE. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Consent Motion to Transfer)(GROTE, PAUL) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 4/30/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORPORATION, Other Affiliate GEORGIA SOUTHERN AND FLORIDA RAILWAY COMPANY, Other Affiliate AIRFORCE PIPELINE INC, Other Affiliate Alabama Great Southern LLC, Other Affiliate Central of Georgia LLC, Other Affiliate Chesapeake Western Railway, Other Affiliate Citico Realty Company, Other Affiliate HIGH POINT RANDLEMAN ASHEBORO AND SOUTHERN RAILROAD COMPANY, Other Affiliate Interstate Railroad Company, Other Affiliate Mobile and Birmingham Railroad Company, Other Affiliate Rail Investment Company, Other Affiliate State University Railroad Company, Other Affiliate Tennessee, Alabama & Georgia Railway Company, Other Affiliate Tennessee Railway Company, Other Affiliate THOROUGHBRED DIRECT INTERMODAL SERVICES INC, Other Affiliate Transworks Company, Other Affiliate Triple Crown Services Company, Other Affiliate Virginia and Southwestern Railway Company, Other Affiliate Wheelersburg Terminal LLC, Other Affiliate Yadkin Railroad Company, Other Affiliate NORFOLK AND PORTSMOUTH BELT LINE RAILROAD COMPANY, Other Affiliate NORFOLK SOUTHERN MEXICANA S DE RL DE CV, Other Affiliate PLS INVESTMENT LLC, Other Affiliate Reading Company, LLC [Virginia], Other Affiliate NORFOLK SOUTHERN INTERNATIONAL INC, Other Affiliate NORFOLK SOUTHERN - MEXICO LLC, Other Affiliate SOUTHERN RAIL TERMINALS INC, Other Affiliate TRANSWORKS INC, Other Affiliate SOUTHERN RAIL TERMINALS OF NORTH CAROLINA INC, Other Affiliate SOUTHERN REGION MATERIALS SUPPLY INC, Other Affiliate TCS LEASING INC, Other Affiliate TCV INC, Other Affiliate TRANSWORKS OF INDIANA INC, Other Affiliate Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company, The, Other Affiliate CINCINNATI NEW ORLEANS AND TEXAS PACIFIC RAILWAY COMPANY THE, Other Affiliate LAMBERTS POINT BARGE COMPANY INC., Other Affiliate NORTH CAROLINA MIDLAND RAILROAD COMPANY THE, Other Affiliate SHENANDOAH VIRGINIA CORPORATION, Other Affiliate SOUTH WESTERN RAIL ROAD COMPANY THE, Other Affiliate SOUTHERN REGION COAL TRANSPORT INC, Other Affiliate READING COMPANY LLC (DELAWARE), Other Affiliate CAMP LEJUNE RAILROAD COMPANY, Other Affiliate CENTRAL OF GEORGIA RAILROAD COMPANY for NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - List of Subsidiaries)(GROTE, PAUL) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 4/30/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BUDCO GROUP INC, PARSEC INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - List of Subsidiaries)(GROTE, PAUL) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 4/30/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 Jurisdictional Statement by BUDCO GROUP INC, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, PARSEC INC (GROTE, PAUL) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 4/30/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, BUDCO GROUP INC, PARSEC INC ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. (vs) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 4/30/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, BUDCO GROUP INC, PARSEC INC ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (vs) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 4/30/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to BUDCO GROUP INC, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, PARSEC INC, XYZ CORP (vs) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 4/30/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, BUDCO GROUP INC, PARSEC INC ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE. (vs) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 4/30/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Elaine M Clark Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-3125485, $400 filed by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet JS44, #2 Exhibit Ex A - Pleadings Served on Defendants, #3 Exhibit Ex B - Notice of Removal Filed in State Court, #4 Exhibit Ex C - Pleadings Served by Defendants)(GROTE, PAUL) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 4/30/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Parsec, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Paul A. Grote
Represented By: G. Randall Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARSEC INC
Represented By: Paul A. Grote
Represented By: G. Randall Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Budco Group, Inc.
Represented By: Paul A. Grote
Represented By: G. Randall Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CORP
Represented By: Paul A. Grote
Represented By: G. Randall Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corp. Nos. 1-21
Represented By: Paul A. Grote
Represented By: G. Randall Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parsec, Inc.
Represented By: Paul A. Grote
Represented By: G. Randall Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Clark
Represented By: Matthew Lincoln Hilt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?