Poole et al v. Stars Medical Transport Inc.
Plaintiff: Khalia Sorrell and Anisha Poole
Defendant: Stars Medical Transport Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01975
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3730
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiffs' First Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant by Anisha Poole, Khalia Sorrell.(Scott, Justin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories to Defendants by Anisha Poole, Khalia Sorrell.(Scott, Justin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures by Anisha Poole, Khalia Sorrell.(Scott, Justin)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER APPROVING #9 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court. This case is assigned to a four-month discovery track. Discovery shall be completed on or before October 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 6/28/19. (jta)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Anisha Poole, Khalia Sorrell. (Scott, Justin)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Disclosures by Stars Medical Transport Inc..(Peake, Joseph)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons by Stars Medical Transport Inc.. (Peake, Joseph)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Stars Medical Transport Inc.. Discovery ends on 10/28/2019.(Peake, Joseph) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 19, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Anisha Poole, Khalia Sorrell. Stars Medical Transport Inc. served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Scott, Justin)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Anisha Poole, Khalia Sorrell. (Scott, Justin)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Stars Medical Transport Inc. (rjs)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8632516) filed by Anisha Poole and Khalia Sorrell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poole et al v. Stars Medical Transport Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stars Medical Transport Inc.
Represented By: Joseph C. Peake, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khalia Sorrell
Represented By: Justin M. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anisha Poole
Represented By: Justin M. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?